Global Patent Index - EP 0858607 B1

EP 0858607 B1 2000-05-10 - DIFFERENTIAL GROUND STATION REPEATER

Title (en)

DIFFERENTIAL GROUND STATION REPEATER

Title (de)

DIFFERENTIELLE BODENZWISCHENSTATION

Title (fr)

REPETEUR DIFFERENTIEL POUR STATION AU SOL

Publication

EP 0858607 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96936671 A

Priority

  • US 9616702 W
  • US 55048895 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9716745A1] A differential global position system wherein a DGPS ground station encodes signals from a plurality of satellites and transmits the encoded signal with satellite-specific pseudo range error signals and a ground station repeater located remote from the DGPS ground station to receive the encoded signal and retransmit it to an airbone object.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G01S 5/14; G01S 1/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01S 1/00 (2006.01); G01S 5/00 (2006.01); G01S 5/14 (2006.01); G01S 19/48 (2010.01); H04B 7/15 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01S 19/07 (2013.01); G01S 5/009 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9716745 A1 19970509; CA 2231392 A1 19970509; CA 2231392 C 20040525; DE 69608297 D1 20000615; DE 69608297 T2 20000831; EP 0858607 A1 19980819; EP 0858607 B1 20000510; JP H11515107 A 19991221; US 5852412 A 19981222

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20161017

2016-11-09 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20161017

2016-10-18 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69608297

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20151030

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150924

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-10-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150924

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-09-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-05-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-06-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-06-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69608297 20000615

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1999-06-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990510

1998-08-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980512

1998-08-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB