Global patent index - EP 0858628 B1

EP 0858628 B1 2000-01-12 - DIGITAL SIGNAL CONTROLLER HAVING MODULAR MACRO AND MICRO INSTRUCTIONS

Title (en)

DIGITAL SIGNAL CONTROLLER HAVING MODULAR MACRO AND MICRO INSTRUCTIONS

Title (de)

DIGITALE SIGNALSTEUERUNG MIT MODULÄREN MACRO UND MICRO BEFEHLEN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE NUMERIQUE AYANT DES MACRO-INSTRUCTIONS ET DES MICRO-INSTRUCTIONS MODULAIRES

Publication

EP 0858628 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96936488 A

Priority

  • US 9616461 W
  • US 54866195 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9715881A1] A digital signal controller is provided having modular operation. Specifically, the digital signal controller includes a sequence control unit and a sequencer for producing a sequence of macro instructions and a sequence of micro instructions, respectively. Changes in the number or order of macro instructions may not require changes to the number and order of micro instructions and vice versa. As such, changes in macro instructions can occur by modifying the sequence control unit and possibly the decoder without necessarily changing the sequencer. Changes in the number and order of micro instructions require changes in the sequencer and possibly the decoder without necessarily changing the sequence control unit. The aforementioned modular technique of forwarding macro and micro instructions to a decoder for controlling an execution unit arranged between an analog interface unit and a DSP allows variability in the operation of the DSP, as well as variability in the design implementation of changes to the digital signal controller.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 9/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 9/22 (2006.01); G06F 9/30 (2006.01); G06F 9/318 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06F 9/223 (2013.01); G06F 9/30145 (2013.01); G06F 9/30196 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9715881 A1 19970501; DE 69606193 D1 20000217; DE 69606193 T2 20000928; EP 0858628 A1 19980819; EP 0858628 B1 20000112; US 5740420 A 19980414

INPADOC legal status

2014-08-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140501

2014-08-14 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69606193

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20140501

2013-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20121031

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-12-01 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 69606193

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Owner name: INTELLECTUAL VENTURES I LLC (N. D. GES. D. STA, US

- Free Format Text: FORMER OWNER: KMB CAPITAL FUND LLC (N. D. GES. STAATES DELAWARE ) ., LOS ALTOS, CALIF., US

- Effective date: 20111010

2011-12-01 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 69606193

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: VON KREISLER SELTING WERNER - PARTNERSCHAFT VO, DE

- Effective date: 20111010

2011-10-10 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 69606193

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE VON KREISLER, SELTING, WERNER, DE

2002-06-05 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20011015

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-10-15 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011015

2000-12-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-09-18 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20000918

- Year of fee payment: 05

2000-02-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 69606193

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20000217

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE GB

2000-01-12 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000112

1999-03-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990208

1998-08-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980128

1998-08-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE GB