Global Patent Index - EP 0858646 B1

EP 0858646 B1 2000-08-30 - WORKSTATION COMPRISING A BRAILLE READING LINE

Title (en)

WORKSTATION COMPRISING A BRAILLE READING LINE

Title (de)

COMPUTERTERMINAL MIT EINER BRAILLE-LESEZEILE

Title (fr)

STATION DE TRAVAIL COMPRENANT UNE LIGNE DE LECTURE EN BRAILLE

Publication

EP 0858646 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96933662 A

Priority

  • NL 9600412 W
  • NL 1001493 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9715909A1] A workstation comprising a keyboard for inputting data, a braille reading line having a number of braille cells located side by side, and a first switch device comprising a number of switch elements located side by side, wherein the first switch device is arranged in or parallel to the braille reading line, and wherein the workstation further comprises a second switch device comprising a number of switch elements located side by side, wherein the second switch device is arranged in or parallel to the braille reading line, so that the first and the second switch device can each be operated by a visually handicapped person without the orientation of the hand relative to a braille cell of the braille reading line being lost.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G09B 21/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 3/02 (2006.01); G09B 21/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G09B 21/007 (2013.01); G09B 21/001 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9715909 A1 19970501; AT 196030 T 20000915; AU 703269 B2 19990325; AU 7229796 A 19970515; CA 2235842 A1 19970501; CA 2235842 C 20020820; DE 69610112 D1 20001005; DE 69610112 T2 20010503; DK 0858646 T3 20001211; EP 0858646 A1 19980819; EP 0858646 B1 20000830; ES 2152042 T3 20010116; GR 3034541 T3 20010131; JP H11513832 A 19991124; NL 1001493 C2 19970425; PT 858646 E 20001229; US 6163280 A 20001219

INPADOC legal status


2003-07-23 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

2003-01-06 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR2

2002-12-31 [REG PT MF4A] REVOCATION OF NATIONAL PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: MF4A

- Effective date: 20011031

2002-11-06 [27W] REVOKED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27W

- Effective date: 20020613

2002-11-06 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPR

- Free Format Text: 20020613

2002-10-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2002-01-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020128

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-12-19 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20011219

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-11-26 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20011126

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-11-16 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20011116

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-10-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20011031

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-10-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20011031

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20011031

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-10-25 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20011025

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-10-19 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20011019

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-10-19 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20011019

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-10-18 [PGFP MC] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20011018

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-10-17 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20011017

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-10-10 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20011010

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-10-09 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20011009

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-10-04 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20011004

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-10-03 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20011003

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-07-02 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: METEC INGENIEUR GMBH

2001-05-02 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: METEC INGENIEUR GMBH

- Effective date: 20010307

2001-01-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2152042

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-12-29 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Ref Legal Event Code: SC4A

- Free Format Text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20001011

2000-12-11 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2000-10-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: R. A. EGLI & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2000-10-27 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-10-18 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ING. A. GIAMBROCONO & C. S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-10-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69610112

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-10-05

2000-09-20 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2000-08-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 196030

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-09-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

1998-09-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19980813

1998-08-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980520

1998-08-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE