Global Patent Index - EP 0858657 A4

EP 0858657 A4 2000-07-05 - SINGLE SURFACED SUPER-DENSITY OPTICAL DISCS

Title (en)

SINGLE SURFACED SUPER-DENSITY OPTICAL DISCS

Title (de)

EINSEITIGE OPTISCHE PLATTEN MIT SEHR HOHER DICHTE

Title (fr)

DISQUES OPTIQUES A TRES HAUTE DENSITE A UNE FACE

Publication

EP 0858657 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 97941171 A

Priority

  • IB 9701237 W
  • US 70888696 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9810418A1] A compact disc with digital data optically recorded thereon has two thickness regions. The first thickness region is a central cylindrical region (1.2 mm), the second thickness region is the remaining annular region of the disc (0.6 mm) having a label area (label applied) and has less than 3/4 and more than 1/4 with the thickness of the first region.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G11B 7/24; B32B 3/02; G03C 5/00; G11B 3/70

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G11B 7/007 (2006.01); G11B 7/24 (2013.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G11B 7/24 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [XY] EP 0610055 A2 19940810 - MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]
  • [Y] DE 4122231 A1 19930107 - WACKER CHEMIE GMBH [DE]
  • [Y] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1995, no. 10 30 November 1995 (1995-11-30)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 006, no. 125 (P - 127) 10 July 1982 (1982-07-10)
  • See also references of WO 9810418A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9810418 A1 19980312; AU 4317197 A 19980326; AU 718994 B2 20000504; EP 0858657 A1 19980819; EP 0858657 A4 20000705; JP H11515131 A 19991221

INPADOC legal status


2001-01-24 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20000803

2000-07-05 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20000519

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-08-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980605

1998-08-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE