Global Patent Index - EP 0858662 A4

EP 0858662 A4 2001-04-18 - LOWER-ENERGY HYDROGEN METHODS AND STRUCTURES

Title (en)

LOWER-ENERGY HYDROGEN METHODS AND STRUCTURES

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTINGEN IN BEZUG AUF DIE NIEDRIGENENERGIE-SPEKTREN VOM WASSERSTOFF

Title (fr)

PROCEDES ET DISPOSITIFS RELATIFS AUX NIVEAUX INFERIEURS D'ENERGIE D'HYDROGENE

Publication

EP 0858662 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 96919010 A

Priority

  • US 9607949 W
  • US 46705195 A
  • US 59271296 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9642085A2] Methods and apparatus for releasing energy from hydrogen atoms (molecules) by stimulating their electrons to relax to quantized lower energy levels and smaller radii (smaller semimajor and semiminor axes) than the "ground state" by providing energy sinks or means to remove energy resonant with the hydrogen energy released to stimulate these transitions. An energy sink, energy hole, can be provided by the transfer of at least one electron between participating species including atoms, ions, molecules, and ionic and molecular compounds. In one embodiment, the energy hole comprises the transfer of t electrons from one or more donating species to one or more accepting species whereby the sum of the ionization energies and/or electron affinities of the electron donating species minus the sum of the ionization energies and/or electron affinities of the electron accepting species equals approximately mX27.21 eV (mX48.6 eV) for atomic (molecular) hydrogen below "ground state" transitions where m and t are integers. The present invention further comprises a hydrogen spillover catalyst, a multifunctionality material having a functionality which dissociates molecular hydrogen to provide free hydrogen atoms which spill over to a functionality which supports mobile free hydrogen atoms and a functionality which can be a source of the energy holes. The energy reactor includes one of an electrolytic cell, a pressurized hydrogen gas cell, and a hydrogen gas discharge cell. A preferred pressurized hydrogen gas energy reactor comprises a vessel; a source of hydrogen; a means to control the pressure and flow of hydrogen into the vessel; a material to dissociate the molecular hydrogen into atomic hydrogen, and a material which can be a source of energy holes in the gas phase. The gaseous source of energy holes includes those that sublime, boil, and/or are volatile at the elevated operating temperature of the gas energy reactor wherein the exothermic reaction of electronic transitions of hydrogen to lower energy states occurs in the gas phase.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G21B 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C01B 3/00 (2006.01); B01J 19/00 (2006.01); F02G 1/043 (2006.01); G21B 1/00 (2006.01); G21B 3/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02G 1/043 (2013.01); G21B 3/00 (2013.01); F02G 2243/52 (2013.01); F02G 2254/11 (2013.01); Y02E 30/18 (2013.01); Y02E 60/324 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • No further relevant documents disclosed
  • See also references of WO 9642085A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9642085 A2 19961227; WO 9642085 A3 19970424; AU 6146596 A 19970109; AU 705379 B2 19990520; BR 9608924 A 20001121; CA 2218895 A1 19961227; CA 2218895 C 20010828; CN 1099305 C 20030122; CN 1187146 A 19980708; EP 0858662 A2 19980819; EP 0858662 A4 20010418; HU 9901773 A2 19990928; HU 9901773 A3 20020628; JP 2001523331 A 20011120; JP 2003238103 A 20030827; JP 2008201671 A 20080904; MX 9709701 A 19980731; PL 186102 B1 20031031; PL 324187 A1 19980511; RU 2180458 C2 20020310; TR 9701501 T1 19980221

INPADOC legal status


2014-05-21 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20131203

2013-12-27 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1015938

2009-04-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090324

2001-04-18 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20010307

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-10-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BLACKLIGHT POWER, INC.

1998-12-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MILLS, RANDELL, L.

1998-12-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: GOOD, WILLIAM, R.

1998-12-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: POPOV, ARTHUR, I.

1998-12-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: PHILLIPS, JONATHAN

1998-08-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971230

1998-08-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE