Global Patent Index - EP 0858670 B1

EP 0858670 B1 2000-01-26 - ELECTRIC CONTACT SWITCH

Title (en)

ELECTRIC CONTACT SWITCH

Title (de)

ELEKTRISCHER KONTAKTSCHALTER

Title (fr)

INTERRUPTEUR DE CONTACT ELECTRIQUE

Publication

EP 0858670 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96945821 A

Priority

  • DE 9602007 W
  • DE 19540536 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19540536A1] An electric contact switch, in particular a micro-switch for motor vehicles, has a housing (1) that carries connection contacts (4) and contains a contact element (5). An actuating element (6) mounted on the housing (1) has a switching lever (13) that acts on the contact element (5). In order to create a small-size contact switch, the contact element (5) has at least one resting branch (11) that is supported on a connection contact (4) and at least one contacting branch (12) that recalls the actuating element (6) and acts upon connection contacts (4) that extend approximately perpendicular to the contacting branch (12).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 1/24 (2006.01); H01H 11/00 (2006.01); H01H 13/64 (2006.01); H01H 21/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 11/0056 (2013.01); H01H 1/242 (2013.01); H01H 13/64 (2013.01); H01H 21/24 (2013.01); H01H 11/0018 (2013.01); H01H 2011/0087 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19540536 A1 19970507; EP 0858670 A2 19980819; EP 0858670 B1 20000126; ES 2143258 T3 20000501; WO 9716839 A2 19970509; WO 9716839 A3 19970626

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20161020

2016-11-09 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20161020

2016-10-21 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59604330

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20151019

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20151027

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20151028

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-10-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 20

2012-01-31 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59604330

- Representative's name: JOCHEN MUELLER, DE

2012-01-31 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59604330

- Representative's name: MUELLER, JOCHEN, DIPL.-ING., DE

2006-01-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20041022

2005-10-21 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051021

2004-12-24 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2004-10-22 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041022

2004-07-21 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2003-10-14 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20031014

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-01-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-06-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-05-24 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000502

2000-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2143258 T3

2000-03-17 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO MASSARI S.R.L.

2000-03-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59604330 20000302

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1999-04-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990315

1998-08-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980411

1998-08-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT