Global Patent Index - EP 0858674 B1

EP 0858674 B1 2001-05-30 - TIME-OF-FLIGHT MASS SPECTROMETER WITH POSITION-SENSITIVE DETECTION

Title (en)

TIME-OF-FLIGHT MASS SPECTROMETER WITH POSITION-SENSITIVE DETECTION

Title (de)

FLUGZEIT-MASSENSPEKTROMETER MIT POSITIONSSENSITIVER DETEKTION

Title (fr)

SPECTROMETRE DE MASSE A TEMPS DE VOL AVEC DETECTEUR SENSIBLE A LA POSITION

Publication

EP 0858674 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96937307 A

Priority

  • DE 19541089 A
  • EP 9604732 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19541089A1] The disclosure relates to a time-of-flight mass spectrometer with position-sensitive detector (20) for determining the energy and momentum of photo-dissociated ions. The detector (20-24) has one or more electron multipliers (21, 22) and an anode matrix (23) located behind the electron multipliers and used for determining the point of impact of the ions. The time-of-flight mass spectrometer has a device (30, 33) for determining the time of flight of the ions.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01J 49/02; H01J 49/40

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01J 49/02 (2006.01); H01J 49/40 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01J 49/40 (2013.01); H01J 49/025 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

DE 19541089 A1 19970507; EP 0858674 A1 19980819; EP 0858674 B1 20010530; US 6031227 A 20000229; WO 9717718 A1 19970515

INPADOC legal status


2004-07-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-06-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-06-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20031031

2004-05-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040501

2003-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031031

2002-12-11 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20021211

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20021030

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-10-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20021030

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-05-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-09-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010810

2001-07-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59607015 20010705

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1998-11-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981001

1998-08-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980429

1998-08-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB