Global Patent Index - EP 0858753 B1

EP 0858753 B1 2002-11-13 - Improved drawer for furniture

Title (en)

Improved drawer for furniture

Title (de)

Verbesserte Schublade für Möbel

Title (fr)

Amélioration pour tiroir de meubles

Publication

EP 0858753 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98102631 A

Priority

ES 9700323 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0858753A2] The side parts (1) each have rapid-fastenings (14) for the drawer's front (5) and which are detachably connected to front flanges (15) each. The front flanges are bent outwards at right angles from the side parts. An operating lever (16) is joined to a rotary cam the tip (26) of which pressed onto a clamping-jaw (27) and pulls back a transverse arm (24) which at the same time moves two movable cores (23) positioned in expandable dowels (17). The dowels fit through guide-slots (21,22) in the front flanges into seatings (18) in the drawer-front and fix them to the side parts.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47B 88/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47B 88/00 (2006.01); A47B 88/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47B 88/95 (2017.01); A47B 88/913 (2017.01); A47B 2210/0045 (2013.01); A47B 2210/02 (2013.01); A47B 2230/11 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0858753 A2 19980819; EP 0858753 A3 19981216; EP 0858753 B1 20021113; BR 9800639 A 19991207; DE 59806227 D1 20021219; ES 2129352 A1 19990601; ES 2129352 B1 20000116; ES 2151783 A1 20010101; ES 2151783 B1 20010601

INPADOC legal status


2008-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070901

2006-02-13 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060213

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-11-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030814

2003-08-29 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2003-05-14 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20021113

2002-12-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59806227 20021219

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-11-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-11-13 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021113

2002-11-13 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021113

2002-11-13 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021113

2002-03-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020122

1999-08-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

1999-07-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990512

1998-12-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-12-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-08-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1998-08-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI