Global Patent Index - EP 0858844 A3

EP 0858844 A3 2000-10-04 - Sonic head

Title (en)

Sonic head

Title (de)

Schallkopf

Title (fr)

Tête sonore

Publication

EP 0858844 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98102214 A

Priority

DE 19705321 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0858844A2] The ultrasound transducer head (1) has a housing (2) enclosing an internal system (3) with a ceramic piezo-element (4) at the base of the housing and an overlying damping element (10). The piezo-element is coupled to a terminal tag (8) projecting from the housing, for connection to an external electronic circuit, with the internal system secured in the housing via a retaining ring (15) fitting into a reception groove (16) provided by the inside wall of the housing.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G10K 11/00; G10K 9/122

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G10K 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G10K 11/004 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0858844 A2 19980819; EP 0858844 A3 20001004; EP 0858844 B1 20020612; AT 219276 T 20020615; DK 0858844 T3 20021007

INPADOC legal status


2017-09-18 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Effective date: 20170228

2017-09-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59804376

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160422

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-29 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20160222

- Year of fee payment: 19

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070209

2006-11-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060901

2006-10-24 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2006-10-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-09-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060901

2006-02-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060228

2006-02-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060228

2006-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060228

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-02-10 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060210

2006-02-09 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060209

2005-03-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: RENTSCH & PARTNER

2005-02-25 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20050225

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-02-11 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20050211

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-02-11 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20050211

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-02-10 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20050210

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-12-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041029

2004-05-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: OK PAT AG PATENTE MARKEN LIZENZEN

2004-05-28 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: LANDIS+GYR GMBH

- Free text: SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT#WITTELSBACHERPLATZ 2#80333 MUENCHEN (DE) -TRANSFER TO- LANDIS+GYR GMBH#HUMBOLDTSTRASSE 64#90459 NUERNBERG (DE)

2003-10-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: LANDIS+GYR GMBH

2003-06-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030313

2003-01-17 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030117

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-11-29 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-10-07 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2002-07-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59804376 20020718

2002-06-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-06-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SIEMENS SCHWEIZ AG

2002-06-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK FR IT LI NL SE

2002-06-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 219276 T 20020615

2001-11-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011008

2001-09-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK FR IT LI NL SE

2001-07-26 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-07-18 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FR GB IT LI

2001-06-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-10-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 10K 11/00 A, 7G 10K 9/122 B

2000-07-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000510

1998-08-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK FR IT LI NL SE

1998-08-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI