Global Patent Index - EP 0858891 B1

EP 0858891 B1 2000-03-15 - Method and apparatus for cleaning a portion of a printing unit of an offset printing machine

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for cleaning a portion of a printing unit of an offset printing machine

Title (de)

Verfahren und Anordnung zur Reinigung eines Teiles eines Druckwerkes einer Offsetdruckmaschine

Title (fr)

Méthode et dispositif de nettoyage d'une partie d'une unité d'impression d'une machine à imprimer offset

Publication

EP 0858891 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98101233 A

Priority

DE 19705632 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0858891A1] The method involves a printer which comprises a rubber blanket (3) and printing cylinder (1), an inker unit (16) and a damping system. The offset printer has a control stand (7) containing a signal processor(8) which has inputs for the control/repeat-back signals of a central setting of metering elements, ink-strip width or lifting cycle. The output of the signal processor is connected to the input of a function generator (9) in the form of a digital storage which is itself connected to a control (6) of the washer (5,5a,5b).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 35/00; B41F 33/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 35/04 (2006.01); B41F 33/00 (2006.01); B41F 35/00 (2006.01); B41F 35/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 33/00 (2013.01); B41F 35/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0858891 A1 19980819; EP 0858891 B1 20000315; AT 190559 T 20000415; DE 19705632 A1 19980903; JP 2834729 B2 19981214; JP H10226051 A 19980825; US 5964157 A 19991012

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110802

2011-12-15 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59800098

- Effective date: 20110802

2010-06-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100121

- Year of fee payment: 13

2005-01-24 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050124

2004-10-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040930

2003-09-02 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2003-01-25 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030125

2003-01-10 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030110

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-10-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20020801

2002-09-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2002-09-11 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20020124

2002-08-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020801

2002-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020131

2002-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020131

2002-01-24 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020124

2002-01-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020124

2002-01-02 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20020102

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-02-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-12-21 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20001221

- Year of fee payment: 4

2000-04-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59800098 20000420

2000-04-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000316

2000-03-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2000-03-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE

2000-03-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-03-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 190559 T 20000415

2000-01-14 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

1999-10-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990831

1999-05-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE

1999-05-06 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE

1998-09-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980708

1998-08-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE

1998-08-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI