Global Patent Index - EP 0858903 B1

EP 0858903 B1 2000-08-16 - Transport device for continuous paper and for cut sheets in printers

Title (en)

Transport device for continuous paper and for cut sheets in printers

Title (de)

Einrichtung zum Transport von Endlospapier und geschnittenen Blättern in Druckern

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour transporter des bandes continues de papier et des feuilles coupées aux imprimantes

Publication

EP 0858903 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98100069 A

Priority

DE 29702659 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0858903A2] The cut sheets are conveyed by means of friction drive pieces with rollers in front of and behind the printer (1,2). The continuous webs of paper (12) are conveyed by means of a pin-feed mechanism fitting into the perforations on both sides. The pin-feed drive pieces (7) are connected to the drive motor (8) for the friction drive pieces (3-6) by a switchable coupling (9). A sensor (10) positioned near the printer or belonging to the pin-feed drive pieces detects the position of the continuous web of paper and or the cut edges of the sheets, and corrects the forward feed by means of the calculator (11) and the motor of the friction drive pieces.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 11/30; B41J 11/48

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 15/04 (2006.01); B65H 5/06 (2006.01); B65H 20/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 20/22 (2013.01); B41J 15/046 (2013.01); B65H 5/062 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 29702659 U1 19971218; EP 0858903 A2 19980819; EP 0858903 A3 19990303; EP 0858903 B1 20000816

INPADOC legal status


2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160120

- Year of fee payment: 19

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090105

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090202

2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090105

2009-11-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20091030

2009-09-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090105

2008-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080122

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-05-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080124

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-05-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080125

- Year of fee payment: 11

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-08-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-11-08 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20001018

2000-09-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59800234 20000921

2000-09-15 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-09-15 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-03-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000131

1999-11-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

1999-05-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990318

1999-03-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-03-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-08-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1998-08-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI