Global patent index - EP 0858957 B1

EP 0858957 B1 2000-11-02 - Container for foodstuffs comprising a closure lid and a tear tab

Title (en)

Container for foodstuffs comprising a closure lid and a tear tab

Title (de)

Behälter jeder Art für Lebensmittel mit einem Verschlussdeckel und einer Abreisslasche

Title (fr)

Récipient pour aliments pourvue d'un couvercle de fermeture et d'une languette d'arrachage

Publication

EP 0858957 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97122474 A

Priority

DE 29702676 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19754693A1] The container (1) is especially for holding salads, and has a lid (2) with a thermoformed base (3), whose perimeter edge (4) is enclosed by a protective element so that the removal of the lid is impeded. It also has a tear-off tab, which is connected to the element by predetermined breaking points. The underside has at least one projection which fits into a corresponding recess in the element, and is connected to this by predetermined breaking points. An opening grip can be accessed after removal of the tab, the projection, and the recess. At least one item of cutlery is accommodated and held so that it can be removed, between retaining elements which are spaced from one another on the base of the lid. The cutlery item is covered by a panel (17) which can be removed from the inner perimeter of the edge of the lid.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 77/24; B65D 51/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 43/02 (2006.01); B65D 43/04 (2006.01); B65D 51/24 (2006.01); B65D 77/24 (2006.01); B65D 81/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 43/0216 (2013.01); B65D 51/247 (2013.01); B65D 77/245 (2013.01); B65D 81/3216 (2013.01); B65D 2101/0015 (2013.01); B65D 2543/00083 (2013.01); B65D 2543/00231 (2013.01); B65D 2543/00296 (2013.01); B65D 2543/00472 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29721837 U1 19980402; AT 197274 T 20001115; DE 19754693 A1 19980820; DE 29702676 U1 19970430; DK 0858957 T3 20010305; EP 0858957 A1 19980819; EP 0858957 B1 20001102; PL 324724 A1 19980817

INPADOC legal status

2003-09-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20030701

2003-08-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2003-08-04 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EBP

2003-07-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030701

2003-07-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030701

2003-01-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030131

2002-12-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021231

2002-12-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021231

2002-12-19 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021219

2002-02-02 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020202

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-12-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20011231

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-12-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20011228

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-12-28 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20011228

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-12-21 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20011221

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-10-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-06-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: SPRITZGUSSWERK KG RICHARD RASSBACH G.M.B.H. & CO.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20001231

2001-05-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2001-05-02 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBV

- Effective date: 20001102

2001-03-30 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2001-03-05 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2001-02-02 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010202

2000-12-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001231

2000-12-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59702566

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-12-07

2000-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FR GB IT LI NL SE

2000-11-02 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001102

2000-11-02 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001102

2000-11-02 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001102

2000-11-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 197274

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-11-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2000-01-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19991215

1999-05-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH DE DK FR GB IT LI NL SE

1999-05-06 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FR GB IT LI NL SE

1999-04-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990215

1998-08-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FR GB IT LI NL SE

1998-08-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI