Global Patent Index - EP 0858960 B1

EP 0858960 B1 2002-11-06 - Underground housing for a refuse receptacle equipped with elevating means

Title (en)

Underground housing for a refuse receptacle equipped with elevating means

Title (de)

Unterirdisches Gehäuse für einen Müllbehälter mit einer Hebevorrichtung

Title (fr)

Enceinte souterraine pour un récipient à ordures équipée avec des moyens élévateurs

Publication

EP 0858960 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 98400348 A

Priority

FR 9701718 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0858960A1] The enclosure comprises a pit (1) buried in the ground. The pit contains a compartment (9-11) which has a roof (10) at ground level. The compartment also has a lifter (2-8) which can pass from the bottom of the pit to the top, where the floor (9) is at ground level. The lifter has a power plug (8) at ground level driven by an external motor (18) which is coupled to the plug by a specific fitting (20). Standard waste containers (12) are located on the floor and the roof supports a waste input hopper (14).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65F 1/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65F 1/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65F 1/1457 (2013.01); B65F 1/1447 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0858960 A1 19980819; EP 0858960 B1 20021106; AT 227233 T 20021115; DE 69809094 D1 20021212; DE 69809094 T2 20030717; DK 0858960 T3 20030303; ES 2186975 T3 20030516; FR 2759682 A1 19980821; FR 2759682 B1 19990402; PT 858960 E 20030331

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2017-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20170220

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170227

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-04-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170221

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-02-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-06-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140216

2016-02-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-10-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150302

2015-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140217

2015-03-27 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20150327

2015-01-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140216

2015-01-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140228

2015-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140902

2015-01-30 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140216

2014-12-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140818

2014-12-11 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69809094

- Effective date: 20140902

2014-12-03 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2014-11-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140217

2014-11-28 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140216

2014-10-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140216

2014-10-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140901

2014-10-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140216

2014-10-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 227233 T

- Effective date: 20140216

2014-09-30 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2014-09-30 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140216

2014-09-29 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

- Effective date: 20140228

2014-09-17 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140901

2014-09-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69809094

2014-08-26 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20140818

2014-07-31 [PGFP MC] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Payment date: 20140407

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-06-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20130222

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-06-28 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20130206

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-05-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20130218

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-04-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20130219

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-04-30 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20130218

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-04-30 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20130215

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130219

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20130218

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130220

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-04-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20130221

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-03-29 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20130220

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-06-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120223

- Year of fee payment: 15

2003-10-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030807

2003-05-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2186975 T3

2003-03-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20030116

2003-03-03 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2003-02-26 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030203

2002-12-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69809094 20021212

2002-11-27 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2002-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-11-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-11-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 227233 T 20021115

2002-04-24 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT

- Owner name: ECOLLECT SARL

2001-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010319

1999-05-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ECOLLECT SARL

1999-05-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-05-06 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-03-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990104

1998-08-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-08-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI