Global Patent Index - EP 0859071 B1

EP 0859071 B1 2002-09-04 - Process for selective galvanic coating of electrical contact elements

Title (en)

Process for selective galvanic coating of electrical contact elements

Title (de)

Verfahren zum selektiven galvanischen Beschichten von elektrischen Kontaktelementen

Title (fr)

Procédé de revêtement sélectif galvanique d'éléments de contact électrique

Publication

EP 0859071 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98101116 A

Priority

DE 19704369 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6149791A] A process and apparatus for the selective electroplating of electrical contact elements, used for coating at least one contact surface of a metal base for the contact elements with an electrolyte, containing a material with a higher conductivity as compared to the base. The electrolyte is applied with a long stretched-out plastic electroplating tip which has a plurality of channel passages through which the electrolyte passes and which are arranged at a right angle to the tip. The plurality of channel passages terminates at and empties into at least one discharge opening which extends along the entire length of the tip. The electroplating tip, when it is in the operating position, is arranged such that the at least one discharge opening is positioned on the bottom and extends horizontally. The electrolyte is supplied to the electroplating tip from above. The base is moved at the lower end of the electroplating tip and parallel to said tip, in such a way that the region thereof, which is intended as contact surface, is located at a uniform distance from and at the level of the discharge opening.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C25D 5/02; H01H 11/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C25D 5/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C25D 5/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IE IT LI LU NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0859071 A2 19980819; EP 0859071 A3 19991027; EP 0859071 B1 20020904; AT 223525 T 20020915; DE 19758513 C2 20000713; DE 59805367 D1 20021010; US 6149791 A 20001121

INPADOC legal status


2018-01-23 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59805367

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170322

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-02-09 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59805367

2013-04-25 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: DIEHL METAL APPLICATIONS GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SCHEMPP & DECKER PRAEZISIONSTEILE UND OBERFLAECHENTECHNIK GMBH, 14167 BERLIN, DE

- Document: DE 59805367

- Effective date: 20130306

2013-04-25 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59805367

- Representative's name: DOERING, ROGER, DIPL.-ING., DE

- Effective date: 20130306

2013-04-25 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59805367

- Effective date: 20130306

2013-03-06 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59805367

- Representative's name: DOERING, ROGER, DIPL.-ING., DE

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SCHEMPP & DECKER PRAZISIONSTEILE UND OBERFLACHENT

- Effective date: 20050131

2006-12-08 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060929

2006-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060131

2005-09-14 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050123

2005-07-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SCHEMPP & DECKER PRAZISIONSTEILE UND OBERFLACHENT

- Effective date: 20050131

2005-01-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050131

2005-01-23 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050123

2005-01-10 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050110

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-04-23 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20040423

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-11-21 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20031121

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-09-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-08-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030605

2003-05-28 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Document: IE 0859071E

2003-03-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-03-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030328

2003-02-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2003-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030131

2003-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030131

2003-01-23 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030123

2003-01-23 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030123

2002-12-04 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021204

2002-10-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59805367 20021010

2002-10-02 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2002-09-25 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020904

2002-09-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IE IT LI LU NL SE

2002-09-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-04 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020904

2002-09-04 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020904

2002-09-04 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020904

2002-09-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 223525 T 20020915

2002-01-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011213

2000-07-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IE IT LI LU NL SE

1999-12-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991026

1999-10-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-10-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-10-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 6C 25D 5/02 A, 6H 01H 11/04 B

1998-08-26 [RHK1] MAIN CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C25D 5/02

1998-08-26 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

1998-08-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IE IT LI LU NL SE

1998-08-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI