Global patent index - EP 0859076 A3

EP 0859076 A3 2000-05-03 - Apparatus for hydroentangling the fibres of a fibre web

Title (en)

Apparatus for hydroentangling the fibres of a fibre web

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum hydrodynamischen Verschlingen der Fasern einer Faserbahn

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'hydro-enchevêtrement de fibres d'une nappe fibreuse

Publication

EP 0859076 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98102048 A

Priority

  • DE 19705292 A
  • DE 19706610 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US5960525A] A device for hydrodynamic entanglement operates to compact the fibers of a fiber web made of natural and/or manmade fibers. The device includes a first endless belt supporting the fiber web, the first endless belt being guided under tension and stretched between at least two rolls, including a reversing roll, and a second endless belt likewise stretched between at least two rolls, the second endless belt being located opposite the first endless belt and traveling in the same direction as the first endless belt, a tight side of the second endless belt being located opposite a tight side of the first endless belt. The second endless belt is driven to turn in the same direction as the first endless belt. The tight sides of the first and second endless belts are directed conically toward one another along their lengths, so that the fiber web lying on the tight side of the first endless belt is increasingly compressed between the advancing first and second endless belts. A pair of rolls is provided for pressing the second endless belt against the reversing roll of the first endless belt for greater wrapping of the reversing roll by the first and second endless belts. An associated needling drum is provided with which at least one nozzle beam is associated across the working width and axially parallel thereto. An additional nozzle beam is provided between the pair of rolls for wetting the fiber web, water jets of the additional nozzle beam being directed against the back of and through the second endless belt and against the fiber web which is compressed and held between the first and second endless belts.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D04H 1/46

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D04H 18/04 (2012.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D04H 18/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] GB 2300429 A 19961106 - COURTAULDS ENG LTD [GB]
  • [AD] FR 2730246 A1 19960809 - ICBT PERFOJET SA [FR]
  • [A] FR 2601970 A1 19880129 - VUILLAUME ANDRE [FR]
  • [A] FLEISSNER VON A: "ALLES AUS EINER HAND", AVR ALLGEMEINER VLIESSTOFF REPORT,DE,DPW VERLAGSGESELLSCHAFT MBH., HEUSENSTAMM, vol. 24, no. 3, 1 January 1996 (1996-01-01), pages 17 - 18,20, XP000636527, ISSN: 0170-4060

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

US 5960525 A 19991005; EP 0859076 A2 19980819; EP 0859076 A3 20000503; EP 0859076 B1 20020828; JP 4005205 B2 20071107; JP H10226950 A 19980825

INPADOC legal status

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160218

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160218

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-02-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 19

2013-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130206

2012-06-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120222

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-10-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100228

2010-10-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100228

2010-09-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2010-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090206

2009-10-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20090206

2009-06-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090226

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-05-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080219

- Year of fee payment: 11

2003-08-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030530

2003-02-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-12-31 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20021205

2002-10-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59805272

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-10-02

2002-08-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2002-08-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2002-08-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020318

2001-01-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-05-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000328

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-08-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

1998-08-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI