Global Patent Index - EP 0859082 B1

EP 0859082 B1 2002-09-18 - Press belt, in particular a pressing shell

Title (en)

Press belt, in particular a pressing shell

Title (de)

Pressband, insbesondere Pressmantel

Title (fr)

Bande pour presse, en particulier une enveloppe de pressage

Publication

EP 0859082 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98101795 A

Priority

DE 19706097 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0859082A2] A press belt, a press surface (2) in particular, is for paper or board machines and features a matrix (10) made of an elastomer and at least two layers of reinforcing threads (14, 16). One of the layers consists of threads (14) which extend in the running direction (L) of the belt while the other layers consist of threads running across the above mentioned direction (L). The threads are at least 0.5 mm thick and the distance (a1) between the transverse threads is a maximum of 3 mm while the distance (a2) the threads (16) that extend in the running direction of the belt (L) is a maximum of 2.5 mm. The distance between the threads of the two layers is 0-4 mm.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21F 3/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21F 3/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21F 3/0227 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0859082 A2 19980819; EP 0859082 A3 19990210; EP 0859082 B1 20020918; DE 19706097 A1 19980820

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-03 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59805562

2017-04-28 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20170213

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170217

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110204

2011-10-04 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2010-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20100212

- Year of fee payment: 13

2003-09-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030619

2002-10-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59805562 20021024

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FI SE

2001-10-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010906

2000-12-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH

1999-10-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990810

1999-10-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FI SE

1999-08-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH SULZER PAPIERTECHNIK PATENT GMBH

1999-02-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-02-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-08-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FI SE

1998-08-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI