Global Patent Index - EP 0859109 A3

EP 0859109 A3 2000-01-26 - Cupboard and the hinges used thereon

Title (en)

Cupboard and the hinges used thereon

Title (de)

Schrankmöbel und dabei anzuwendendes Scharnierelement

Title (fr)

Placard et les charnières utilisées là-dessus

Publication

EP 0859109 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 97203618 A

Priority

NL 1004588 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0859109A2] The door (4) is pivotally fixed to the furniture by a row of hinge elements (18) fixed to the furniture. At least one of the hinge elements is fixed to the at least one shelf (3). At least one stop piece (11) co-operates with the door. The shelf and hinge element have at least two openings (21). The shelf has at least one grooved cavity (23) taking the plate-shaped part of the T-shaped hinge element, the arm (24) of which has the same width as the cavity in the shelf. The plate-shaped part of the hinge element has a folded end part (27).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05D 5/02; A47B 61/00; E05D 11/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47B 61/00 (2006.01); E05D 5/02 (2006.01); E05D 11/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47B 61/00 (2013.01); E05D 5/0215 (2013.01); E05D 5/023 (2013.01); E05D 11/06 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/20 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0859109 A2 19980819; EP 0859109 A3 20000126; EP 0859109 B1 20040317; DE 59711422 D1 20040422; NL 1004588 A1 19980603; NL 1004588 C2 19980702

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120601

2012-09-20 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59711422

- Effective date: 20120601

2012-08-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111130

2012-07-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120601

2012-06-13 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120601

2012-05-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *OPENBAAR LICHAAM SOCIALE WERKVOORZIENING DRECHTST

- Effective date: 20111130

2011-03-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20101126

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20101129

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20101130

- Year of fee payment: 14

2005-03-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041220

2004-04-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59711422 P 20040422

2004-03-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE NL

2003-02-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021218

2000-10-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE NL

2000-09-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000712

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-08-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE DE NL

1998-08-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI