Global Patent Index - EP 0859111 A3

EP 0859111 A3 2000-07-19 - Electrical garage door drive

Title (en)

Electrical garage door drive

Title (de)

Elektrischer Garagentorantrieb

Title (fr)

Commande électrique de porte de garage

Publication

EP 0859111 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98102324 A

Priority

DE 19705550 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0859111A2] The carriage (24) from which protrudes a bar-shaped element (26) runs along the runner rail (22) by using the drive mechanism. The runner rail, on the side from which the bar-shaped element protrudes, is closed as far as a longitudinal gap (58) which just allows the bar-shaped element to pass through it. The runner rail on the side from which the bar-shaped element protrudes is open and is closed by subsequently placed covers (54,56) as far as the gap. The outer ends of the U-sectioned profile (42) of the runner rail has inward-projecting arms (50,52) ending at a distance (A) from one another.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05F 15/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05F 15/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05F 15/668 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/106 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0859111 A2 19980819; EP 0859111 A3 20000719; DE 19705550 A1 19980820; DE 19705550 C2 20020905

INPADOC legal status


2004-11-24 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040520

2003-05-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030411

2001-03-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE GB IT LI LU NL

2001-02-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001209

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-08-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE GB IT LI LU NL

1998-08-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI