Global Patent Index - EP 0859128 B1

EP 0859128 B1 2000-04-05 - Turbine disc with cooling channels

Title (en)

Turbine disc with cooling channels

Title (de)

Turbinen-Laufradscheibe mit Kühlluftkanälen

Title (fr)

Disque de turbine avec canaux refroidissement

Publication

EP 0859128 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98101046 A

Priority

DE 19705442 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0859128A1] The impeller disc has cooling channels (4) going from its edge. These channels open out into disc slots (2) in which air-cooled turbine blades (3) are inserted. Into each slot open out at least two channels coming from the same edge of the disc. Preferably, in each slot, the mouths of two cooling channels lie beside each other in a common plane at right angles to the disc axis. For each slot, two cooling channels are provided that are mirror-symmetric to, as well as inclined to, a plane of symmetry leading in the radial direction from the disc axis to the middle of the groove.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01D 5/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01D 5/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01D 5/081 (2013.01); F01D 5/087 (2013.01); F01D 5/3015 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0859128 A1 19980819; EP 0859128 B1 20000405; DE 19705442 A1 19980820; US 6022190 A 20000208

INPADOC legal status


2010-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100122

2010-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100803

2010-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100201

2010-10-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100930

2010-09-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100122

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090119

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090129

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090302

- Year of fee payment: 12

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-04-13 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

2001-04-13 [REG FR CJ] CHANGE IN LEGAL FORM

2001-03-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-03-21 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: ROLLS-ROYCE DEUTSCHLAND LTD & CO KG

2000-09-01 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

2000-09-01 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2000-08-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-05-31 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000504

2000-05-17 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: ROLLS-ROYCE DEUTSCHLAND GMBH

2000-05-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59800115 20000511

2000-05-10 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: ROLLS-ROYCE DEUTSCHLAND GMBH

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1999-07-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990521

1999-05-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

1999-05-06 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1998-11-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980915

1998-08-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1998-08-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI