Global Patent Index - EP 0859144 B1

EP 0859144 B1 2001-04-18 - Diaphragm carburettor

Title (en)

Diaphragm carburettor

Title (de)

Membranvergaseranlage

Title (fr)

Carburateur à membrane

Publication

EP 0859144 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97120260 A

Priority

DE 19705639 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0859144A2] The membrane carburettor has a membrane-controlled control chamber (15) for the fuel (K) with a number of fuel channels (10,16,18,21) and an air intake channel (1) for air (L). It has at least one part-loading channel (16,18) and an idling channel (21), where each part-loading channel (16,18) is separated from the idling channel over their whole length. Each fuel channel (10,16,18,21) is blocked from an air feed, independently of the working condition.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 7/06; F02M 17/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 3/08 (2006.01); F02M 7/06 (2006.01); F02M 17/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 3/08 (2013.01); F02M 7/06 (2013.01); F02M 17/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

ES FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0859144 A2 19980819; EP 0859144 A3 19990120; EP 0859144 B1 20010418

INPADOC legal status


2002-04-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-04-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Inventor name: HEYBECK, MANFRED

2001-10-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011030

2001-09-14 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2001-09-14 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Inventor name: HEYBECK, MANFRED

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): ES FR IT

2001-04-18 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010418

2001-04-18 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010418

2001-04-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: FISCHER, MARTIN

2001-04-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HEYBECK, MANFRED

2000-11-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001004

1999-11-04 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

1999-09-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: ES FR IT

1999-03-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990120

1999-01-27 [RHK1] MAIN CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F02M 7/06

1999-01-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-01-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-08-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): ES FR IT

1998-08-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI