Global Patent Index - EP 0859152 A3

EP 0859152 A3 2000-02-23 - Rotary pump

Title (en)

Rotary pump

Title (de)

Rotationspumpe

Title (fr)

Pompe rotative

Publication

EP 0859152 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98301015 A

Priority

GB 9702852 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0859152A2] Traditionally the pump inlet and outlet ports are in a horizontal orientation. However, for some applications the ports of the pump are required to be in a vertical orientation. A rotary pump assembly 1 comprises a rotary pump 2 and pump mounting means 4. The rotary pump 2 comprises a rotor containing assembly 6 and a gear containing assembly 8. The rotor containing assembly 6 comprises a pair of inter-engaging piston/lobe rotors 10, 12 mounted for contra-rotation within a rotor case portion 7 about substantially parallel axes 13, 14; the rotor case portion is formed with an inlet port 9 and an outlet port 11 and comprises a circular cover plate 111. Substantially parallel shafts 15, 16 also mounted for rotation about the axes 13, 14 respectively, are connected to the respective rotors 10, 12. The rotors 10, 12 are secured on to the respective shafts 15, 16 by clamping/retaining nuts 17, 18. The shafts 15, 16 extend from the rotor containing assembly 6 along the axes 13, 14 through the mounting means 4 and into the gear containing assembly 8. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04C 2/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04C 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04C 15/00 (2013.01); F04C 2230/60 (2013.01); F04C 2240/30 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0859152 A2 19980819; EP 0859152 A3 20000223; GB 9702852 D0 19970402

INPADOC legal status


2001-04-19 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2001-03-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20000301

2000-11-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-08-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-08-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI