Global Patent Index - EP 0859195 A3

EP 0859195 A3 2000-10-04 - Method and device for controlling the gas exhaust for a heating apparatus with a burner, in particular fan-assisted burner

Title (en)

Method and device for controlling the gas exhaust for a heating apparatus with a burner, in particular fan-assisted burner

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Steuerung der Abgasführung für ein Heizgerät mit einem insbesondere gebläseunterstützten Brenner

Title (fr)

Méthode et appareil pour contrôler l'évacuation des gaz des fumées pour un appareil de chauffage avec un brûleur, en particulier assisté par un ventilateur

Publication

EP 0859195 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 97121018 A

Priority

DE 19705597 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0859195A2] The gas exhaust duct (24) from the burner is ducted into a chamber bounded by walls (12) tapering to smaller diameter at the top. The exhaust duct enters the chamber via a bend to generate a suction effect. The bottom edges of the chamber walls have gaps (32) covered by pendant mounted flaps (36). These control the fresh airflow into the chamber to match the suction effect of the exhaust gasses and hence the flow rate of the exhaust gasses. For small burner settings the smaller flow rates of exhaust gasses draw in small flow rates of cooling air via the flaps. The high burn rates generate more suction in the exhaust chamber and cause the flaps to swing inwards to admit more air. In the event of a beck pressure in the exhaust flue the flaps are forced outwards to allow excess pressure to be safely vented.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24C 15/00; F23J 13/04; F23M 9/00; F24B 1/189

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23M 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23M 9/006 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0859195 A2 19980819; EP 0859195 A3 20001004; EP 0859195 B1 20031112; DE 19705597 A1 19980820

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160601

2016-06-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59710992

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150127

- Year of fee payment: 18

2004-11-19 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2004-11-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040813

2004-05-12 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20031112

2004-05-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2004-02-23 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040223

2003-12-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59710992 P 20031218

2003-11-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL

2003-11-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-11-12 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031112

2003-11-12 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031112

2003-11-12 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031112

2003-11-12 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031112

2003-06-04 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: GAS EXHAUST FOR A HEATING APPARATUS

2002-01-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011122

2001-06-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT NL

2001-05-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010404

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-10-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 24C 15/00 A, 7F 23J 13/04 B, 7F 24B 1/189 B, 7F 23M 9/00 B

1998-08-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL

1998-08-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI