Global Patent Index - EP 0859198 B1

EP 0859198 B1 2002-12-11 - Smoke extracting hood

Title (en)

Smoke extracting hood

Title (de)

Dunstabzugshaube

Title (fr)

Hotte aspirante pour buée

Publication

EP 0859198 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98102741 A

Priority

DE 19706305 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0859198A1] The extract hood has radial extract fans (3) at the top/rear of a plenum chamber closed at the bottom by a filter (2). A foam fitting (5) is mounted over the top of the fans and has its lower surface shaped to match the airflow into the fans. The foam cladding deadens the fan noise as well as shaping the airflow. The foam cladding is covered with an elastic coating layer which prevents moisture from entering the foam. This ensures that the sound deadening properties of the foam are maintained.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24C 15/20; F04D 29/66

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04D 29/66 (2006.01); F24C 15/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04D 29/664 (2013.01); F24C 15/20 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

EP 0840063 A1 19980506 - ELECTROLUX ABP [SE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0859198 A1 19980819; EP 0859198 B1 20021211; AT 229631 T 20021215; DE 19706305 A1 19980820; ES 2189013 T3 20030701

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170217

2018-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170228

2018-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170901

2017-12-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20171031

2017-09-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59806572

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160222

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160229

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160222

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160223

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-02-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-11-27 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: BSH HAUSGERATE GMBH

- Effective date: 20151022

2015-06-02 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: BSH HAUSGERATE GMBH

- Effective date: 20150527

2015-05-13 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: BSH HAUSGERAETE GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: BSH BOSCH UND SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE GMBH, 81739 MUENCHEN, DE

- Document: DE 59806572

- Effective date: 20150402

2015-02-17 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-11-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140218

2014-09-30 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2013-04-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20130219

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120217

2013-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120217

2012-12-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 229631 T

- Effective date: 20120217

2012-10-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120217

2011-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110221

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20110217

- Year of fee payment: 14

2003-12-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030912

2003-08-29 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2189013 T3

2003-05-07 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030415

2003-04-01 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-01-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59806572 20030123

2002-12-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT SE

2002-12-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-12-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 229631 T 20021215

2001-06-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010430

1999-05-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE ES FR GB IT SE

1999-05-06 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT SE

1999-04-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990217

1998-08-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT SE

1998-08-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI