Global Patent Index - EP 0859436 B1

EP 0859436 B1 2000-07-19 - Spark plug for an internal combustion engine

Title (en)

Spark plug for an internal combustion engine

Title (de)

Zündkerze für eine Brennkraftmaschine

Title (fr)

Bougie d'allumage pour moteur à combustion interne

Publication

EP 0859436 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98102016 A

Priority

DE 19705372 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0859436A1] The spark plug has an electrically conducting body. A central electrode (3) protrudes from the body, and is insulated from it. An earth electrode (4) is electrically connected to the body, and is formed as a ring which forms an annular spark gap about the protruding part of the central electrode. The central electrode has a noble metal reinforcement on the surface bounding the spark gap, as has the earth electrode. The reinforcement of the earth electrode is a bush and on the central electrode is a sleeve. The ring electrode consists of nickel or a nickel alloy.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01T 13/46; H01T 13/39

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01T 13/39 (2006.01); H01T 13/46 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01T 13/39 (2013.01); H01T 13/467 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0859436 A1 19980819; EP 0859436 B1 20000719; AT 194886 T 20000815; DE 19705372 A1 19980820; DE 19705372 C2 20020627; ES 2149621 T3 20001101; US 6064144 A 20000516

INPADOC legal status


2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160302

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-01-09 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59800197

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: KOTITSCHKE & HEURUNG PARTNERSCHAFT MBB PATENT-, DE

2013-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110206

2012-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110206

2012-04-11 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20120411

2012-02-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110205

2012-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110228

2011-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110205

2011-11-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110205

2011-11-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20111102

2011-10-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20110205

2011-10-04 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2010-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100210

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-06-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100209

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100210

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100224

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100222

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100226

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-04-30 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGRI

- Effective date: 20091201

2005-02-05 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050205

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-07-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-11-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2149621

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-08-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-08-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59800197

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-08-24

2000-08-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000728

2000-08-04 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO TORTA S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT SE

2000-07-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 194886

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-08-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

1999-11-03 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: SPARK PLUG FOR AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE

1999-05-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT DE ES FR GB IT SE

1999-05-06 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT SE

1999-03-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990119

1999-02-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19981201

1998-08-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT SE

1998-08-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI