Global Patent Index - EP 0859648 B1

EP 0859648 B1 2003-06-25 - DEVICE FOR AUTOMATICALLY STOPPING THE FALL OF PERSONNEL WORKING HIGH ABOVE GROUND

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR AUTOMATICALLY STOPPING THE FALL OF PERSONNEL WORKING HIGH ABOVE GROUND

Title (de)

AUTOMATISCHES FALLSCHUTZGERÄT FÜR GROSSE HÖHENARBEIT

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF D'ARRET AUTOMATIQUE DE CHUTE POUR DES PERSONNELS TRAVAILLANT EN HAUTEUR

Publication

EP 0859648 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97933737 A

Priority

  • FR 9701305 W
  • FR 9608841 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9802210A1] The device comprises, inside a case, a tightening cam (7) hinged about an axis (8) such that, unused, it does not engage a belaying rope (2) passing through the case and, when the device is subjected to a set acceleration downwards, it pivots towards the rope (2) to tighten it to the case with self-tightening effect. On the cam (7) is mounted a detecting roller (10) which co-operates with the rope (2) when the cam (7) is unused. A spring actuated (13) friction piece (12), at a certain rotational speed of the roller (10), subjects it to a resisting moment which triggers off the pivoting of the cam (7) in the tightening direction. A lever (15), to which the user is linked, engages in a unidirectional manner the cam (7) to push it in tightening position if the user falls. The device simultaneously triggers off several tightening effects in case of a fall.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A62B 35/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A62B 35/00 (2006.01); A62B 35/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A62B 1/14 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9802210 A1 19980122; AU 3698397 A 19980209; AU 729685 B2 20010208; BR 9702343 A 19991228; CA 2231722 A1 19980122; CA 2231722 C 20050322; CN 1100576 C 20030205; CN 1197401 A 19981028; CZ 292340 B6 20030917; CZ 9800798 A3 19980617; DE 69723046 D1 20030731; DE 69723046 T2 20040401; EP 0859648 A1 19980826; EP 0859648 B1 20030625; ES 2202628 T3 20040401; FR 2751233 A1 19980123; FR 2751233 B1 19981009; JP 3262279 B2 20020304; JP H11512958 A 19991109; PL 184120 B1 20020930; PL 325518 A1 19980803; US 6056086 A 20000502

INPADOC legal status


2012-06-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110715

2012-05-10 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69723046

- Effective date: 20120201

2012-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120201

2012-03-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110715

2011-11-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100716

2011-08-18 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20110818

2011-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100715

2011-05-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110201

2011-02-16 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110201

2010-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100705

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100621

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-10-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20100621

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090718

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-10-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20090723

- Year of fee payment: 13

2004-06-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040326

2004-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2202628 T3

2003-11-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031016

2003-07-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69723046 P 20030731

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT NL

2003-06-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-05-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: TRACTEL S.A.S.

1998-08-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980408

1998-08-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT NL