Global Patent Index - EP 0859649 B1

EP 0859649 B1 2003-06-04 - FIRE-EXTINGUISHER SYSTEM AND VALVE UNIT THEREFOR

Title (en)

FIRE-EXTINGUISHER SYSTEM AND VALVE UNIT THEREFOR

Title (de)

LÖSCHEINRICHTUNG UND VENTILBLOCK FÜR EINE LÖSCHEINRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF D'EXTINCTION ET ENSEMBLE SOUPAPE POUR LEDIT DISPOSITIF

Publication

EP 0859649 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97932836 A

Priority

  • DE 29612431 U
  • EP 9703823 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9803227A1] The invention concerns a fire-extinguisher system and a valve unit therefor. The object of the invention is to provide a fire-extinguisher system whose reaction time until sparks are extinguished is short. To that end, the extinguisher system has an extinguishant-conveying pipe (14) which leads from an extinguishant reservoir to at least one extinguishing point where it terminates at an extinguishant-discharge nozzle (16). Provided in the region of said nozzle (16) is an extinguishant container (20) from which extinguishant subsequently flows into the pipe (14) when the pressure therein drops. A valve unit according to the invention for an extinguisher system facilitates the arrangement of such an extinguishant container.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A62C 35/68

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A62C 35/68 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A62C 35/68 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29612431 U1 19971120; EP 0859649 A1 19980826; EP 0859649 B1 20030604; US 6119785 A 20000919; WO 9803227 A1 19980129

INPADOC legal status


2005-06-15 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20050124

2004-03-31 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: MINIMAX GMBH

- Effective date: 20040207

2003-09-04 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030904

2003-08-19 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030819

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-07-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59710222 P 20030710

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE IT SE

2003-06-04 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030604

1998-08-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980219

1998-08-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE IT SE