Global patent index - EP 0859675 B1

EP 0859675 B1 2001-05-23 - A MACHINE AND A METHOD FOR CASTING A METAL STRIP

Title (en)

A MACHINE AND A METHOD FOR CASTING A METAL STRIP

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM GIESSEN EINES METALLBANDES

Title (fr)

MACHINE ET PROCEDE DE COULEE DE BANDES DE METAL

Publication

EP 0859675 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96927983 A

Priority

  • SE 9601020 W
  • SE 9502867 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9706906A1] Thin metal strips, for example wide carbon steel strips, are cast in a single belt machine. The width of the molten metal on the belt is defined by side dams (12, 13) on the belt (11). The side dams have inwardly directed surfaces against the molten metal which makes the surface of the molten metal even also at its edges.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22D 11/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/06 (2006.01); B22D 11/10 (2006.01); B22D 11/103 (2006.01); B22D 11/119 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/0631 (2013.01); B22D 11/066 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR GB SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9706906 A1 19970227; AT 201341 T 20010615; AU 6760596 A 19970312; CA 2228180 A1 19970227; CZ 9800441 A3 19980715; DE 69612992 D1 20010628; DE 69612992 T2 20011213; EP 0859675 A1 19980826; EP 0859675 B1 20010523; JP 3567225 B2 20040922; JP H11510739 A 19990921; KR 100443113 B1 20040918; SE 508311 C2 19980921; SE 9502867 D0 19950816; SE 9502867 L 19970217; ZA 9606913 B 19980703

INPADOC legal status

2015-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150303

2015-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140816

2015-05-29 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140817

2015-05-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140816

2015-05-28 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69612992

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20150303

2015-04-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20140816

2015-04-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM01

- Ref Document Number: 201341

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Effective date: 20140816

2015-03-31 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2015-03-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69612992

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2013-11-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130821

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-10-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130813

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-10-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130821

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130821

- Year of fee payment: 18

2004-06-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2004-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040430

2002-08-12 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020812

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-05-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-11-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2001-06-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69612992

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-06-28

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB SE

2001-05-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 201341

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-06-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2001-05-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: HOLMBERG, ANDERS

2001-05-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: HOLMGREN, ALLAN

2001-05-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SMS DEMAG AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1999-02-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990108

1998-08-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980518

1998-08-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB SE