Global Patent Index - EP 0859720 B1

EP 0859720 B1 2000-05-24 - CLOSING DEVICE FOR CONTAINERS

Title (en)

CLOSING DEVICE FOR CONTAINERS

Title (de)

VERSCHLUSSVORRICHTUNG FÜR BEHÄLTER

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE BOUCHAGE POUR RECIPIENTS

Publication

EP 0859720 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96945873 A

Priority

  • DE 9602142 W
  • DE 19541830 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19541830A1] The invention relates to a closing device for containers with flowable agents, in particular for cleansing agents, cosmetics or the like, which device comprises a housing securable with the container opening so as to be agent-proof and having an outlet tube connected to an outlet which releases the agent, comprises a closing member used to close the outlet tube so as to be agent-proof and to open said tube, and comprises an actuating member used to move the closing member to its ideal position. When different agents of highly variable viscosity have to be stored in the container there is frequently the desire to open optionally defined opening cross-sections of the outlet pipe so that different agents can be dosed in a simple and accurate manner. In this connection, the invention proposes to structure the closing member in such a manner the agent can pass therethrough. One end area of said member has an inlet receivable by a sealing seat (11) to be agent-proof, and another end area is connected to the outlet (13) releasing the agent. The closing member (8) and sealing seat (11) can be spaced in relation to each other and the inlet of the closing member (8) can be opened in at least two different opening cross-sections depending on the spacing. The component moved during the spacing of the closing member (8) and the sealing seat (11) is guided across its entire path of movement in an agent-proof guide. It is particularly advantageous when the actuating member is constructed as a tilting lever and the closing member as a vertical, height-adjustable pipe section consisting of a flexible material and with its lower end surface having an opening which can rest against the sealing seat to form a seal.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 47/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 47/20 (2006.01); B65D 47/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 47/2006 (2013.01); B65D 47/283 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

DE 19541830 A1 19970515; EP 0859720 A2 19980826; EP 0859720 B1 20000524; WO 9717261 A2 19970515; WO 9717261 A3 19970612

INPADOC legal status


2004-01-09 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

- Ref Legal Event Code: CA

2003-09-12 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2003-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-06-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

2003-06-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030603

2003-05-23 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

2002-11-07 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021107

2002-04-16 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020416

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-04-02 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020402

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-03-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020328

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-05-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-09-20 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000825

2000-09-15 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-06-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59605322

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-06-29

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1998-10-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19980915

1998-08-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980502

1998-08-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB