Global Patent Index - EP 0859722 B1

EP 0859722 B1 2000-04-26 - TAMPER-PROOF CLOSURE

Title (en)

TAMPER-PROOF CLOSURE

Title (de)

ORIGINALITÄTSVERSCHLUSS

Title (fr)

FERMETURE INVIOLABLE

Publication

EP 0859722 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96945717 A

Priority

  • DE 9602143 W
  • DE 19541990 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19541990A1] The invention concerns a tamper-proof seal intended to show the intact state of a container seal of a closure cap which bulges over a container wall and a container aperture provided in the container wall and capable of being detachably joined to the closure cap. In the closed state, the peripheral border of the closure cap is close to or in contact with the container. The proposed seal consists of at least one indicator element (4) which in the closed state is located between the container wall and the closure cap; a first end of the indicator element (4) projects radially underneath the closure cap towards the central line of the container and has a retaining element with a branch (43) extending upwards tranversely to the longitudinal axis of the indicator element (4), while a second end projects radially outwards. In order to simplify the fitting of such indicator elements and reduce the number of parts required, it is proposed that the indicator element (4) should be connected by its first end on the inner side of the closure cap (1) to at least one securing device and that the securing device should be located on the upper end of the retaining device.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 55/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 47/36 (2006.01); B65D 55/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 55/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

DE 19541990 A1 19970515; BR 9611394 A 20000829; CA 2237175 A1 19970515; EP 0859722 A2 19980826; EP 0859722 B1 20000426; JP H11514956 A 19991221; US 6135302 A 20001024; WO 9717262 A2 19970515; WO 9717262 A3 19970619

INPADOC legal status


2004-01-09 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

2003-09-12 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2003-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-06-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

2003-06-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030603

2003-05-23 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2002-11-07 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021107

2002-04-16 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20020416

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-03-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20020328

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-03-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20020328

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-04-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-08-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-07-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000620

2000-05-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59605071 20000531

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1999-09-29 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: TAMPER-PROOF CLOSURE

1998-10-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980915

1998-08-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980502

1998-08-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB