Global Patent Index - EP 0859727 B1

EP 0859727 B1 2000-04-05 - CONTAINER FOR TRANSPORTING SPECIAL WASTE AND HAZARDOUS MATERIAL

Title (en)

CONTAINER FOR TRANSPORTING SPECIAL WASTE AND HAZARDOUS MATERIAL

Title (de)

BEHÄLTER FÜR SONDERABFALL- UND GEFAHRGUTTRANSPORT

Title (fr)

CONTENEUR POUR LE TRANSPORT DE DECHETS SPECIAUX ET DE PRODUITS DANGEREUX

Publication

EP 0859727 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96934790 A

Priority

  • DE 19542084 A
  • EP 9604594 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19542084A1] A container for transporting special waste and hazardous material comprises an outer container (1) provided with a sealing border (3) around its opening (2). The outer container (1) can be closed off by a lid (4). A sheeting inner container is fitted inside the outer container (1) and has a ready-made edging border (10) adapted to the shape of the sealing border (3) and fitted on the sealing border (3) without folds. The lid (4) is provided with a lid cover (11) made of sheeting and covering at least the lid bottom.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65F 1/06; B65F 1/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 85/84 (2006.01); B65F 1/06 (2006.01); B65F 1/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65F 1/1615 (2013.01); B65D 85/84 (2013.01); B65F 1/06 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19542084 A1 19970515; AT 191421 T 20000415; AU 7297596 A 19970605; EP 0859727 A1 19980826; EP 0859727 B1 20000405; WO 9718147 A1 19970522

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091023

2010-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091023

2010-10-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091031

2010-10-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091031

2010-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091023

2010-07-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100501

2010-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091102

2010-07-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100630

2010-05-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2009-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20081029

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20081028

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-02-27 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20081027

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-01-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20081031

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20081002

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080909

- Year of fee payment: 13

2007-09-28 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG;POSTFACH 1772;8027 ZUERICH (CH)

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-05-11 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2001-04-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: POTZSCH HOLGER

- Effective date: 20001031

2001-03-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-01-31 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2001-01-09 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010109

2000-12-29 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: POETZSCH, HOLGER TRANSFER- BISCHOF UND KLEIN GMBH

2000-11-22 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: BISCHOF UND KLEIN GMBH & CO.

2000-11-22 [RIN2] INVENTOR CHANGED AFTER GRANT

- Free text: POETZSCH, HOLGER

2000-10-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001031

2000-10-23 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001023

2000-09-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2000-08-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-08-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000710

2000-07-05 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000705

2000-07-05 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000705

2000-07-05 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000705

2000-06-30 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO TORTA S.R.L.

2000-06-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2000-05-17 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2000-05-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59604909 20000511

2000-04-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2000-04-05 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000405

2000-04-05 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000405

2000-04-05 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000405

2000-04-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 191421 T 20000415

1999-07-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990607

1998-08-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980429

1998-08-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IE IT LI LU NL PT SE