Global Patent Index - EP 0859734 B1

EP 0859734 B1 2000-03-08 - YARN FEEDER

Title (en)

YARN FEEDER

Title (de)

FADENLIEFERGERÄT

Title (fr)

FOURNISSEUR DE FIL

Publication

EP 0859734 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96938150 A

Priority

  • DE 19542045 A
  • EP 9604889 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19542045A1] The invention relates to yarn feeder (F) with a storage drum (T), an unwinding brake (A) which has a storage drum (T) counter-braking surface (G) continuous in the peripheral direction and coaxial to the axis (X) of the storage drum and which has a braking component (E) supported on the counter-braking surface axially counter to the direction of yarn unwinding so as to produce spring action and having a coaxial braking surface (H) also continuous in the peripheral direction. Said apparatus also has a mounting (7) for the braking component (E), and a pneumatic brake opening device (V) which has a pressure chamber (14) with a pneumatically loadable, axially movable boundary wall (W). Said boundary wall (W) is connected to the braking component (E) so as to transmit movement at least in the direction of movement thereof counter to the action of the spring (11). When the boundary wall (W) is pressurised by excess pressure or a vacuum, the braking component (E) can be moved axially into a threading position (EI) in which the braking surface (H) is lifted from the counter-braking surface (G).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 51/22; D03D 47/34

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 51/22 (2006.01); D03D 47/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D03D 47/364 (2013.01); D03D 47/365 (2013.01); D03D 47/366 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE FR IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19542045 A1 19970515; CN 1079365 C 20020220; CN 1202141 A 19981216; EP 0859734 A1 19980826; EP 0859734 B1 20000308; US 6058982 A 20000509; WO 9717277 A1 19970515

INPADOC legal status


2013-08-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121107

2011-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20101124

- Year of fee payment: 15

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *IRO A.B.

- Effective date: 20041130

2005-06-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050601

2005-05-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *IRO A.B.

- Effective date: 20041130

2004-11-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041130

2003-12-23 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20031223

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-11-24 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20031124

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-08-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20020601

2002-07-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2002-06-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020601

2001-11-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011130

2001-11-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011130

2001-02-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-11-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20001128

- Year of fee payment: 5

2000-11-23 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20001123

- Year of fee payment: 5

2000-08-04 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-05-02 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

2000-04-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59604617 20000413

2000-03-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BOVARD AG PATENTANWAELTE

2000-03-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR IT LI NL SE

2000-03-08 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000308

2000-03-08 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000308

1999-04-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990302

1998-08-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980420

1998-08-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR IT LI NL SE