Global Patent Index - EP 0859947 A4

EP 0859947 A4 2000-04-05 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR OPTICAL PACKAGE FOR PROVIDING FEEDBACK

Title (en)

DEVICE AND METHOD FOR OPTICAL PACKAGE FOR PROVIDING FEEDBACK

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR RÜCKKOPPLUNG IN EINER OPTISCHEN BAUGRUPPE

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE DE CONSTITUTION D'UN PAQUET OPTIQUE EN VUE D'UNE RETROACTION

Publication

EP 0859947 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 97934097 A

Priority

  • US 9712023 W
  • US 68297396 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9802719A1] The present invention provides a device (200, 300) and a method (100) for providing optical feedback for an optical package. The device includes: an optical emitter (202), responsive to an electrical input current (208), for generating a beam of light; a partially reflective holographic optical element/reflector (204), arranged to allow a first predetermined portion of the beam to exit the partially reflective holographic optical element/reflector and to diffract a second predetermined portion of the beam to an optical sensing unit (206); and the optical sensing unit, arranged to receive the second predetermined portion of the beam, for generating feedback for adjusting the electrical input current to the optical emitter based on a received optical power of the second predetermined portion of the beam.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G01J 1/32; G06K 7/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01J 1/02 (2006.01); G01J 1/42 (2006.01); G06K 7/10 (2006.01); H01L 33/00 (2006.01); H01S 5/00 (2006.01); H01S 5/0683 (2006.01); H01S 5/022 (2006.01); H01S 5/183 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06K 7/10851 (2013.01); G06K 2207/1015 (2013.01); G06K 2207/1018 (2013.01); H01S 5/02212 (2013.01); H01S 5/02296 (2013.01); H01S 5/0264 (2013.01); H01S 5/0683 (2013.01); H01S 5/183 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] EP 0605929 A1 19940713 - KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]
  • [E] EP 0786839 A1 19970730 - SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 009, no. 234 (E - 344) 20 September 1985 (1985-09-20)
  • See also references of WO 9802719A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9802719 A1 19980122; CA 2230811 A1 19980122; CN 1197510 A 19981028; EP 0859947 A1 19980826; EP 0859947 A4 20000405; JP H11513198 A 19991109; TW 486846 B 20020511

INPADOC legal status


2002-09-04 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20020201

2000-04-05 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20000222

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1998-10-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980722

1998-10-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: YEH, JANG-HUN, (JAMES)

1998-10-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: HARTON, AUSTIN, V.

1998-10-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: JIANG, WENBIN

1998-10-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: LEBBY, MICHAEL

1998-10-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: LUREY, DANIEL, M.

1998-10-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: MORIKUNI, JAMES, J.

1998-10-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: WYATT, KARL

1998-08-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB