Global patent index - EP 0860036 B1

EP 0860036 B1 2000-01-26 - MECHANICAL COUPLING DEVICE

Title (en)

MECHANICAL COUPLING DEVICE

Title (de)

MECHANISCHE KOPPLUNGSVORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

COUPLEUR MECANIQUE

Publication

EP 0860036 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96941341 A

Priority

  • US 9618109 W
  • US 650695 P
  • US 1080696 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9717741A1] A device (20) for coupling first and second electrical connectors (40, 70) comprises a dielectric member having a plurality of openings (32) extending therethrough, a first portion (34) of the openings (32) being adapted to grip corresponding exposed body portions (68) of terminals (60) secured in a first connector (40), and a second portion (36) of the openings (32) being adapted to grip corresponding exposed body portions (98) of terminals (90) secured in a second connector (70). Upon placing the first and second connectors (40, 70) adjacent each other and positioning the openings (32) in gripping relationship with respective body portions (68, 98) of the terminals (60, 90) of the first and second connectors (40, 60), the device (20) mechanically secures together the first and second connectors (40, 70) adjacent each other.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/514

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/514 (2006.01); H01R 12/50 (2011.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/514 (2013.01); H01R 12/716 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9717741 A1 19970515; CN 1113436 C 20030702; CN 1201558 A 19981209; DE 69606424 D1 20000302; DE 69606424 T2 20000803; EP 0860036 A1 19980826; EP 0860036 B1 20000126; JP 2000500272 A 20000111; JP 3865779 B2 20070110

INPADOC legal status

2014-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131111

2014-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131202

2014-08-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140603

2014-08-28 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69606424

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20140603

2014-08-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20140731

2014-07-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20131111

2013-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20121126

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20121206

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20121128

- Year of fee payment: 17

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-01-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-05-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-03-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69606424

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-03-02

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT

2000-01-26 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000126

2000-01-26 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000126

1999-03-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990126

1998-08-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980423

1998-08-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT