Global Patent Index - EP 0860124 B1

EP 0860124 B1 2002-11-13 - Applicator set for product like lipstick

Title (en)

Applicator set for product like lipstick

Title (de)

Auftragvorrichtung für Substanzen wie Lippenstift

Title (fr)

Ensemble d'application pour produit de type rouge à lèvres

Publication

EP 0860124 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 98400112 A

Priority

FR 9701683 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0860124A1] Applicator (1) includes a compartment (4) for the applicator (6) comprising a product dissolving or gelling at the surface on contact with liquid. The applicator is mounted detachably through an opening (11). A second compartment (5), isolated from the first, contains an absorbent (14). This is impregnated with the liquid composition, and is able to moisten the applicator (6) which is introduced through the second opening (18) onto the absorbent surface (50). A system of closures (3, 8, 9, 11, 18, 20) seals the openings. Preferably the applicator is a block of alum, a portion of lipstick, cosmetic foundation, polyvinyl alcohol (PVA), guar gum or a skin care product.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A45D 40/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A45D 34/04 (2006.01); A45D 40/18 (2006.01); A45D 40/26 (2006.01); B05C 17/00 (2006.01); B65D 83/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A45D 40/26 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

FR 2759262 A1 19980814; FR 2759262 B1 19990319; CA 2226649 A1 19980813; CA 2226649 C 20030415; DE 69809309 D1 20021219; DE 69809309 T2 20030320; EP 0860124 A1 19980826; EP 0860124 B1 20021113; ES 2187902 T3 20030616; JP 2877789 B2 19990331; JP H10230207 A 19980902; US 5895162 A 19990420; US RE38016 E 20030304

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070121

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060118

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070122

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070131

2008-04-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20070122

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070121

2007-11-09 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070930

2007-09-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070121

2007-08-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070801

2006-02-15 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20060215

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-01-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060131

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-01-19 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060119

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-01-10 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060110

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-11-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030814

2003-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2187902 T3

2003-03-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030217

2002-12-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69809309 20021219

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2002-11-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-10-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010905

1999-05-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

1999-05-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1999-04-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990226

1998-08-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT