Global Patent Index - EP 0860139 B1

EP 0860139 B1 2000-04-19 - Nozzle for vacuum cleaner

Title (en)

Nozzle for vacuum cleaner

Title (de)

Bodendüse für Staubsauger

Title (fr)

Buse d'aspirateur de poussière

Publication

EP 0860139 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98101683 A

Priority

DE 19706945 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0860139A1] A ground nozzle for a vacuum cleaner has a housing, a pivoting and rotating connecting union for the suction pipe, a ground-side support at the rear end of the housing and a base plate designed as a plastic moulding with a ground-side suction channel and a suction mouth in the middle. The housing has plastic upper part with a fixed air guide channel in it. The base plate is inserted into this housing and held on it in pivoting/movable fashion. Bearing pegs as well as the mounts working with the pegs in locking fashion are formed on the back side of the plate as well as on the inside of the housing in one-piece fashion.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47L 9/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 9/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47L 9/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0860139 A1 19980826; EP 0860139 B1 20000419; EP 0860139 B2 20030716; DE 19706945 A1 19980827

INPADOC legal status


2016-05-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160120

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160121

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160111

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160127

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-01-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 19

2004-04-30 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET3

2003-08-26 [REG SE RPEO] EP PATENT HAS BEEN REPUBLISHED IN MODIFIED FORM AFTER OPPOSITION AT EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: RPEO

2003-07-16 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27A

- Effective date: 20030716

2003-07-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT SE

2001-03-14 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: DUEPRO AG

- Effective date: 20010119

2000-07-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-05-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59800126

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-05-25

2000-05-11 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ING. A. GIAMBROCONO & C. S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT SE

1999-11-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19991004

1999-05-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR IT SE

1999-05-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT SE

1998-09-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980709

1998-08-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT SE

1998-08-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI