Global Patent Index - EP 0860183 B1

EP 0860183 B1 2002-11-13 - Noxious component removal process and system

Title (en)

Noxious component removal process and system

Title (de)

Verfahren und System zur Entfernung von Schadstoffen

Title (fr)

Procédé et système d'élimination des composés nocifs

Publication

EP 0860183 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 98102829 A

Priority

  • JP 3872697 A
  • JP 3872897 A
  • JP 3872997 A
  • JP 3873797 A
  • JP 16091197 A
  • JP 16091497 A
  • JP 26599397 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0860183A2] A process for removing chlorine and/or sulfur from a waste containing chlorine and/or sulfur which chlorine is a source of dioxin. The process comprises the following steps in the sequence set forth: (a) mixing the waste and a chlorine and sulfur removal agent to form a mixture, the chlorine and sulfur removal agent containing an alkali metal compound; and (b) heating the mixture to thermally decompose the waste to generate chlorine-containing substance and/or a sulfur-containing substance, in which the chlorine-containing substance and/or the sulfur-containing substance allow to contact and react with the chlorine and sulfur removal agent thereby to form harmless chloride and/or sulfite. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A62D 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A62D 3/34 (2007.01); A62D 101/22 (2007.01); A62D 101/47 (2007.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A62D 3/34 (2013.01); A62D 2101/22 (2013.01); A62D 2101/47 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0860183 A2 19980826; EP 0860183 A3 19990120; EP 0860183 B1 20021113; AT 227598 T 20021115; AU 5632998 A 19980827; AU 714634 B2 20000106; CN 1095687 C 20021211; CN 1197685 A 19981104; DE 69809310 D1 20021219; DE 69809310 T2 20030320; DK 0860183 T3 20030310; ES 2186931 T3 20030516; MY 121329 A 20060128; NO 316905 B1 20040621; NO 980758 A 19980825; NO 980758 D0 19980223

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070218

2008-11-28 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080901

2008-11-03 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080901

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060221

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070228

2008-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070218

2008-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070901

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *MEIDENSHA K.K.

- Effective date: 20060228

2007-11-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20071030

2007-10-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070218

2007-05-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20060220

2007-02-13 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20070213

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-10-24 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2006-10-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-09-25 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

2006-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060428

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-02-28 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060228

2006-02-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060228

2006-02-28 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060228

2006-02-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060228

2006-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060228

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-02-20 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060220

2006-02-19 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060219

2006-02-18 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060218

2006-02-18 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060218

2006-02-16 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060216

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-03-09 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20050309

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-02-17 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20050217

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-02-16 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20050216

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-02-11 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20050211

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-02-11 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20050211

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-02-10 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20050210

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-02-10 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20050210

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-11-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030814

2003-07-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-05-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2186931 T3

2003-03-10 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2002-12-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69809310 20021219

2002-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

2002-11-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-11-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 227598 T 20021115

2002-04-03 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: NOXIOUS COMPONENT REMOVAL PROCESS AND SYSTEM

2000-05-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000320

1999-09-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

1999-01-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-01-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-08-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980218

1998-08-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

1998-08-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI