Global Patent Index - EP 0860216 B1

EP 0860216 B1 2001-05-23 - Drive for a continuous drawing device for the straight drawing of tubes or bars

Title (en)

Drive for a continuous drawing device for the straight drawing of tubes or bars

Title (de)

Antrieb für eine kontinuierliche Ziehvorrichtung zum Geradeausziehen von Rohren oder Stangen

Title (fr)

Entrainement pour un dispositif d'étirage continu pour l'étirage-droit de tubes ou barres

Publication

EP 0860216 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98250053 A

Priority

DE 19708709 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19708709C1] The mechanism draws straight pipes or bars, having two pairs of opposite endless chains running round the sprockets (9). Tools on the chains engage with the outside surface of the work, pulling it continuously through a drawing ring preceding the drawing unit. The transmission mechanism between the motor (1) and driven sprockets incorporates a speed-increasing gear (5), whose input shaft (4) is coupled to the motor shaft (2) via a spider-type universal joint (3). The motor and input shafts include an angle (B) other than 180 deg , and the gear ratio is determined by the formula n1\/n2 = Number of sprocket teeth\/2. The angle included by the shafts can be adjustable.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21C 1/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21C 1/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21C 1/30 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19708709 C1 19980312; AT 201338 T 20010615; EP 0860216 A1 19980826; EP 0860216 B1 20010523

INPADOC legal status


2005-02-17 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050217

2004-12-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041029

2004-09-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040901

2004-02-17 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040217

2003-02-08 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030208

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-02-06 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030206

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-02-05 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20030205

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-05-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-07-27 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: GUZZI E RAVIZZA S.R.L.

2001-06-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59800741 20010628

2001-06-15 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR IT

2001-05-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 201338 T 20010615

2000-11-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000919

2000-05-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SMS DEMAG AG

1999-05-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE FR IT

1999-05-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR IT

1999-01-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981112

1998-08-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR IT

1998-08-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI