Global Patent Index - EP 0860220 A3

EP 0860220 A3 2000-07-26 - Pressing device

Title (en)

Pressing device

Title (de)

Pressgerät

Title (fr)

Presse

Publication

EP 0860220 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 97114623 A

Priority

DE 29703052 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0860220A2] The pressing device is operated by an electric drive (6) controlled by a control device (22) whose power capacity is controlled through control parameters stored on the interchangeable pressing tool (2), such as in a memory chip. The memory chip is connected to the part of the power control in the drive through an electric circuit or wire-less, e.g. electromagnetically or optically. At least the control parameters can be down loaded in a control memory of the power control.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21D 39/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21D 39/04 (2006.01); B25B 27/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25B 27/10 (2013.01); B21D 39/046 (2013.01); B21D 39/048 (2013.01); B25B 27/146 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49913 (2013.01); Y10T 29/53004 (2013.01); Y10T 29/53009 (2013.01); Y10T 29/53039 (2013.01); Y10T 29/53061 (2013.01); Y10T 29/53087 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29703052 U1 19970403; EP 0860220 A2 19980826; EP 0860220 A3 20000726; EP 0860220 B1 20030205; EP 0860221 A2 19980826; EP 0860221 A3 20000726; EP 0860221 B1 20030326; EP 0860222 A2 19980826; EP 0860222 A3 20000726; EP 0860222 B1 20011107; EP 0860223 A2 19980826; EP 0860223 A3 20000726; EP 0860223 B1 20011205; US 6202290 B1 20010320

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160830

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160824

- Year of fee payment: 20

2010-03-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ALDO ROEMPLER PATENTANWALT

2005-08-23 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050823

2004-06-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040430

2004-04-14 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

2004-01-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031106

2003-10-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-08-23 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030823

2003-06-18 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-03-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59709268 P 20030313

2003-02-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-02-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2003-02-05 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-06-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010424

2001-04-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR GB IT LI

2001-03-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001206

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI

1998-08-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

1998-08-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI