Global Patent Index - EP 0860222 A3

EP 0860222 A3 2000-07-26 - Pressing device and process for storing the press displacement or remaining press displacement

Title (en)

Pressing device and process for storing the press displacement or remaining press displacement

Title (de)

Pressgerät sowie Verfahren zum Einspeichern des Presswegs oder des Restpresswegs

Title (fr)

Presse et procédé pour le stockage des données de déplacement ou du déplacement résiduel de la presse

Publication

EP 0860222 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 97114625 A

Priority

DE 29703052 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0860220A2] The pressing device is operated by an electric drive (6) controlled by a control device (22) whose power capacity is controlled through control parameters stored on the interchangeable pressing tool (2), such as in a memory chip. The memory chip is connected to the part of the power control in the drive through an electric circuit or wire-less, e.g. electromagnetically or optically. At least the control parameters can be down loaded in a control memory of the power control.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21D 39/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21D 39/04 (2006.01); B25B 27/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25B 27/10 (2013.01); B21D 39/046 (2013.01); B21D 39/048 (2013.01); B25B 27/146 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49913 (2013.01); Y10T 29/53004 (2013.01); Y10T 29/53009 (2013.01); Y10T 29/53039 (2013.01); Y10T 29/53061 (2013.01); Y10T 29/53087 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29703052 U1 19970403; EP 0860220 A2 19980826; EP 0860220 A3 20000726; EP 0860220 B1 20030205; EP 0860221 A2 19980826; EP 0860221 A3 20000726; EP 0860221 B1 20030326; EP 0860222 A2 19980826; EP 0860222 A3 20000726; EP 0860222 B1 20011107; EP 0860223 A2 19980826; EP 0860223 A3 20000726; EP 0860223 B1 20011205; US 6202290 B1 20010320

INPADOC legal status


2016-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160301

2016-04-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150831

2016-04-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150831

2016-03-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2016-03-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59705272

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2015-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141029

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140821

- Year of fee payment: 18

2010-03-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: ALDO ROEMPLER PATENTANWALT

2005-08-23 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050823

2004-06-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2004-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040430

2004-04-14 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

2003-08-23 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030823

2002-10-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-08-19 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020819

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-07-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020730

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-02-20 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20020128

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-12-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59705272

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-12-13

2001-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2001-11-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2001-04-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010308

2001-04-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: CH DE FR GB IT LI

2001-02-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001209

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI

1998-08-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

1998-08-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI