Global Patent Index - EP 0860224 B1

EP 0860224 B1 2000-12-06 - Apparatus with deployable storage magazine for the expansion of the tubes of heat exchanger assemblies of the finned type

Title (en)

Apparatus with deployable storage magazine for the expansion of the tubes of heat exchanger assemblies of the finned type

Title (de)

Vorrichtung mit einem ausklappbaren Lagerregal zur Ausweitung der Rohre von Wärmeaustauschbatterien vom Rippenrohrtyp

Title (fr)

Machine à magasin escamotable de stockage pour la dilatation des tubes des batteries d'échange thermique du type aileté

Publication

EP 0860224 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 98420013 A

Priority

FR 9701027 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0860224A1] A cross-head (3), sliding vertically within a portal frame (1), carries a line of tool-rods (10), each ending in an olive-shaped expansion part. Finned tubes arrayed (15) on a rack (11), hinged at the frame foot, are each aligned with a tool-rod when an actuator (13) raises the track to the vertical. The expansion parts are then simultaneously forced, hydraulically, through the tubes, producing the desired diameter. On changing the array, some tools have to be added or removed. With the cross-head raised and the rack lowered, a magazine (19), holding tools in vertical tubes, is pushed (21, 22) under the cross-head, which lowers the old and picks up the new set while locking plates are released and reapplied. The head is newly displaced to disengage the selected rods while the magazine that the motor mechanism returns finally to the skipped position to permit the widening operation. Selectors (12) on the rack determine the new configuration.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21D 53/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21D 53/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21D 53/085 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR IT

EPO simple patent family

FR 2758750 A1 19980731; FR 2758750 B1 19990312; DE 69800417 D1 20010111; DE 69800417 T2 20010419; EP 0860224 A1 19980826; EP 0860224 B1 20001206; ES 2152740 T3 20010201

INPADOC legal status


2005-04-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20040124

2005-01-23 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050123

2004-10-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040930

2004-08-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040803

2004-01-24 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040124

2003-01-08 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030108

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-12-23 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20021223

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20021128

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-11-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-02-22 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ING. ZINI MARANESI & C. S.R.L.

2001-02-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2152740 T3

2001-01-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69800417 20010111

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT

2000-05-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000417

1999-05-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR IT

1999-05-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT

1999-01-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981116

1998-08-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT

1998-08-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI