Global Patent Index - EP 0860288 B1

EP 0860288 B1 2001-05-16 - Thermal printing head coating

Title (en)

Thermal printing head coating

Title (de)

Beschichtung für Thermodruckkopf

Title (fr)

Revêtement pour tête d'impression thermique

Publication

EP 0860288 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97200518 A

Priority

EP 97200518 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0860288A1] A thermal printing head comprising an outermost protective layer and a coating on the outermost surface of the outermost protective layer, characterized in that the coating comprises a hydrolyzed silane, the silane having the general formula: SiR<1>R<2>R<3>R<4> wherein R<1>, R<2> and R<3> are independently a C1 to C4 alkoxy group, a substituted C1 to C4 alkoxy group, bromine or chlorine; and R<4> is a C1 to C4 alkyl group; a substituted C1 to C4 alkyl group, a C1 to C4 alkoxy group or a substituted C1 to C4 alkoxy group; a coating process therefor; and a thermographic printing process utilizing said coated thermal printing head.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 2/335; B41J 2/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05D 5/08 (2006.01); B41J 2/16 (2006.01); B41J 2/335 (2006.01); C09D 183/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/3353 (2013.01); B41J 2/1606 (2013.01); B41J 2/3355 (2013.01); B41J 2/3356 (2013.01); B41J 2/33565 (2013.01); B41J 2/3357 (2013.01); B41J 2/3359 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0860288 A1 19980826; EP 0860288 B1 20010516; DE 69704844 D1 20010621; DE 69704844 T2 20011108; JP H10235915 A 19980908

INPADOC legal status


2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080222

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080229

2009-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080902

2008-12-12 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20081031

2008-10-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080222

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070125

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-08-10 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2007-04-25 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2007-01-26 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070126

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-01-26 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070126

- Year of fee payment: 11

2002-05-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-02-20 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: AGFA-GEVAERT

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-08-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-06-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69704844 20010621

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-09-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000816

1999-05-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

1999-05-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1999-04-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990226

1998-08-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB