Global Patent Index - EP 0860341 B1

EP 0860341 B1 2001-05-02 - Method and device for operationd and/or control of systems for tilting of vehicle bodies

Title (en)

Method and device for operationd and/or control of systems for tilting of vehicle bodies

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Steuerung und/oder Regelung von Wagenkasten-Neigesystemen

Title (fr)

Méthode et dispositif de commande et/ou régulation des systèmes d'inclinaison des caisses des véhicules

Publication

EP 0860341 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97122497 A

Priority

  • DE 19707174 A
  • DE 19753355 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0860341A1] A procedure for open and/or closed control of a rail carriage tilt system has the tilt values measured to adjust the system. These tilt values, when at least one threshold for comfort and/or parameter describing the system would be exceeded, are then converted into matched tilt set points, matched as tilt set points taking account of this/these threshold(s). The matched tilt set points are used to adjust the tilt system. The tilt set points result in tilt system states simulated as theoretical tilt set points in a computer. The states are replaced by maximum permitted states which determine themselves from the threshold for comfort and/or the parameters describing the system. These replaced tilt system states are reckoned back through an inverse simulation of the ... stored in the computer, the system describing the carriage tilt system, to a permitted matched theoretical tilt set point. Ägenitive noun or phrase missingÜ

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B61F 5/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B61F 5/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B61F 5/22 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0860341 A1 19980826; EP 0860341 B1 20010502; CA 2230072 A1 19980822; CA 2230072 C 20040810; US 6108596 A 20000822

INPADOC legal status


2013-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120102

2012-11-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111219

2012-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111231

2012-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111231

2012-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120703

2012-10-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111220

2012-10-25 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59703467

- Effective date: 20120703

2012-09-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120831

2012-07-31 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2012-07-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2011-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20101222

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20101228

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-03-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20101214

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-02-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20101224

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110104

- Year of fee payment: 14

2007-10-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: ANF-INDUSTRIE

- Free text: ANF-INDUSTRIE#PLACE DES ATELIERS, 1#59154 CRESPIN (FR) -TRANSFER TO- ANF-INDUSTRIE#PLACE DES ATELIERS, 1#59154 CRESPIN (FR)

2003-01-31 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2002-10-15 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: TZN FORSCHUNGS- UND ENTWICKLUNGSZENTRUM UNTERLUESS

2002-04-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-06-29 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-06-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59703467 20010607

2001-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-05-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR IT LI SE

2001-03-06 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: CALVANI SALVI E VERONELLI S.R.L.

2000-10-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000907

2000-10-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: TZN FORSCHUNGS- UND ENTWICKLUNGSZENTRUM UNTERLUESS

1999-05-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR IT LI SE

1999-05-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR IT LI SE

1998-09-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980722

1998-08-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR IT LI SE

1998-08-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI