Global Patent Index - EP 0860396 B1

EP 0860396 B1 2000-11-29 - Corkscrew with support portion of variable length

Title (en)

Corkscrew with support portion of variable length

Title (de)

Korkenzieher mit Abstützhebel variabler Länge

Title (fr)

Tire-bouchon avec bras d'appui de longueur variable

Publication

EP 0860396 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 98500040 A

Priority

ES 9700307 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0860396A1] The corkscrew (13) is pivoted to the middle of a U-section metal body (10) with a knife blade (12) at one end and a thrust arm (15') at the other to press against the edge of the bottle neck while the cork is being withdrawn. The thrust arm has an additional inner sliding member (15) with an end recess (17), actuated by a cam surface (28) on the end of the handle so that it is extended automatically as the cork is withdrawn from the neck of the bottle. The sliding member is spring-loaded so that it returns to its original position inside the thrust arm after use.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B67B 7/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B67B 7/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B67B 7/0429 (2013.01); B67B 2007/0458 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR IT LI PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0860396 A1 19980826; EP 0860396 B1 20001129; AR 009164 A1 20000308; DE 69800405 D1 20010104; DE 69800405 T2 20010628; ES 2128968 A1 19990516; ES 2128968 B1 20000116; PT 860396 E 20010430; US 6101900 A 20000815

INPADOC legal status


2005-02-12 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050212

2004-12-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041029

2004-09-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040901

2004-08-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040831

2003-01-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030130

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-01-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030128

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-01-28 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20030128

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-10-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2002-02-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020228

2002-02-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020228

2001-11-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-04-30 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20010130

2001-02-16 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO FERRARIO

2001-01-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69800405 20010104

2000-11-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR IT LI PT

1999-09-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990716

1999-05-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR IT LI PT

1999-05-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR IT LI PT

1999-03-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981222

1998-08-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR IT LI PT

1998-08-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI