Global Patent Index - EP 0860577 A3

EP 0860577 A3 2001-02-14 - An architectural opening covering assembly

Title (en)

An architectural opening covering assembly

Title (de)

Abdeckung für eine architektonische Öffnung

Title (fr)

Couverture pour ouverture architectonique

Publication

EP 0860577 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98301180 A

Priority

  • EP 98301180 A
  • EP 97200475 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0860577A2] A window covering assembly having first and second rails adapted to be secured to first and second sides of a window frame, at least one resiliently tensionable cable member (16) extending between the first and second rails, a flexible covering material (14) being supported and guided by the tensionable cable members between extended and contracted conditions of material. Tensioning means (18) are provided to tension the cable members (16), the tensioning means comprising a slider (18) manually longitudinally slidable along one of said rails, to which said at least one cable member (16) is attached, and a clamp, preferably a self-locking clamp formed on said slider to clamp the slider at a desired location on the second rail (12). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 9/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/323 (2006.01); E06B 9/327 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/323 (2013.01); E06B 9/327 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0860577 A2 19980826; EP 0860577 A3 20010214; EP 0860577 B1 20020508

INPADOC legal status


2017-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170221

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170215

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-05-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20170210

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170214

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170112

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-01-12 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-01-08 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-02-10 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2003-05-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030211

2002-08-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-06-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69805233 20020613

2002-05-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT NL

2001-10-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010827

2001-07-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010521

2001-02-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-08-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

1998-08-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI