Global patent index - EP 0860596 A3

EP 0860596 A3 2000-01-26 - Method for controlling the smooth running of an internal combustion engine

Title (en)

Method for controlling the smooth running of an internal combustion engine

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Regelung der Laufruhe eines Verbrennungsmotors

Title (fr)

Méthode de commande de la stabilité de marche d'un moteur à combustion interne

Publication

EP 0860596 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98101982 A

Priority

DE 19706807 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0860596A2] A procedure for controlling the quietness of a multi-cylinder IC engine depending on the measured value of running noise has a threshold specified for the noise and a control parameter is adjusted in small steps in the direction of increased noise if the measured value of the noise indicates quieter running than the threshold. The parameter is adjusted in a larger step in the direction of reduced noise if the measured value of the noise indicates louder running than the threshold. The change of the parameter takes place with a frequency of at least one hertz. As a measured value for the running noise, a value for the uniformity of rotation of a crankshaft sensor is used.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02D 41/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/1497 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0860596 A2 19980826; EP 0860596 A3 20000126; EP 0860596 B1 20030507; DE 19706807 A1 19980827; DE 19706807 C2 19990128

INPADOC legal status

2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110901

2012-02-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110205

2012-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110228

2012-01-12 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59808206

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20110901

2011-11-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20111102

2011-10-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110205

2010-06-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100226

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100107

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100222

- Year of fee payment: 13

2005-04-22 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2004-04-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040210

2004-03-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-06-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 59808206

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20030612

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-05-28 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030507

2003-05-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-05-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2000-10-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB

2000-05-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000316

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-08-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1998-08-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI