Global patent index - EP 0860601 A3

EP 0860601 A3 2000-01-19 - A fuel injection system for an internal combustion engine

Title (en)

A fuel injection system for an internal combustion engine

Title (de)

Kraftstoffeinspritzsystem für eine Brennkraftmaschine

Title (fr)

Système d'injection de combustible pour moteur à combustion interne

Publication

EP 0860601 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98102970 A

Priority

  • JP 3799697 A
  • JP 20060197 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0860601A2] In the fuel injection system, fuel is supplied to a common rail from a high pressure fuel pump, and injected into the cylinders of an engine, from the common rail, via fuel injection valves. An electronic control unit (ECU) of the engine controls the pressure in the common rail at a value determined by the operating conditions of the engine. The ECU further detects the pressure and the temperature of the fuel in the common rail, and determines the bulk modulus of elasticity of the fuel based on the pressure and the temperature of the fuel. The ECU calculates an estimated value of the pressure change in the common rail during the fuel injection period using the determined bulk modulus. If the difference between the estimated value of the pressure change and the pressure change actually measured during the fuel injection period is large, the ECU determines that the fuel injection system has failed. Since the estimated value of the pressure change is calculated based on the bulk modulus of elasticity which is determined in accordance with the actual pressure and temperature of the fuel, the accurate estimated value is obtained even if the pressure and the temperature of the fuel in the common rail change over a very wide range. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02D 41/38; F02D 41/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 63/00 (2006.01); F02D 41/22 (2006.01); F02D 41/38 (2006.01); F02D 45/00 (2006.01); F02M 65/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/221 (2013.01); F02D 41/3827 (2013.01); F02D 2041/224 (2013.01); F02D 2200/0604 (2013.01); F02D 2200/0606 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0860601 A2 19980826; EP 0860601 A3 20000119; EP 0860601 B1 20021127; DE 69809614 D1 20030109; DE 69809614 T2 20030410; JP 3796912 B2 20060712; JP H10299557 A 19981110

INPADOC legal status

2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130903

2014-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130228

2014-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130220

2013-12-12 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69809614

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20130903

2013-11-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20131031

2013-10-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20130220

2012-06-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120215

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120215

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120221

- Year of fee payment: 15

2006-05-10 [REG GB 746] REGISTER NOTED 'LICENCES OF RIGHT' (SECT. 46/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 746

- Effective date: 20060419

2003-11-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030828

2003-04-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-01-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69809614

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-01-09

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2002-11-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2002-06-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020425

2000-09-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-08-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980220

1998-08-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1998-08-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI