Global Patent Index - EP 0860638 B1

EP 0860638 B1 2002-11-06 - Device and process of laying ceramic tubes without excavation

Title (en)

Device and process of laying ceramic tubes without excavation

Title (de)

Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum grabenlosen Verlegen von Steinzeugrohren

Title (fr)

Dispositif et procédé de pose de tubes céramiques sans excavation

Publication

EP 0860638 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98102809 A

Priority

DE 19707286 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0860638A1] The device comprises a drill bar (14) with a retractable head (16) and central holding shaft (18) aligned with the drill bar and to which a counter pressure plate (32) is fixed. A number of centering devices (22) extend radially outwards from the holding shaft (18). The holding shaft comprises different individual segments (18a,18b), which are connectable to one another by threads (20) or pin connections. The outer diameter of the retractable head (16) is equal to the outer diameter of the pipe (24) to be retracted or larger than it. On one individual segment of the holding shaft centering devices (22) are located in at least two positions axially spaced apart. Each centering device comprises a number of regulatable hydraulic cylinders which extend radially outwards from the holding shaft and can be regulated individually. The centering devices incorporate a number of leaf springs extending radially outwards from the holding shaft and having a curved shape.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F16L 1/028; E21B 7/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E21B 7/30 (2006.01); E21B 17/08 (2006.01); E21B 17/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E21B 17/10 (2013.01); E21B 7/30 (2013.01); E21B 17/08 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

US 5403122 A 19950404 - GRANELLA BRUNO [CH]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB LI NL PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0860638 A1 19980826; EP 0860638 B1 20021106; AT 227403 T 20021115; DE 19707286 C1 19981119; ES 2202670 T3 20040401; PT 860638 E 20030131

INPADOC legal status


2008-06-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030218

2004-09-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040901

2004-08-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040831

2004-08-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20030219

2004-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2202670 T3

2003-11-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2003-11-03 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030901

2003-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031031

2003-10-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030807

2003-10-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-10-08 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

2003-09-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030901

2003-05-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030530

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-03-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-02-28 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030228

2003-02-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030228

2003-02-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030228

2003-02-19 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030219

2003-02-18 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030218

2003-02-18 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030218

2003-01-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20021108

2002-12-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59806135 20021212

2002-11-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021106

2002-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB LI NL PT

2002-11-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-11-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 227403 T 20021115

2000-08-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000713

1999-05-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE ES FR GB LI NL PT

1999-05-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB LI NL PT

1998-11-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980928

1998-08-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB LI NL PT

1998-08-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI