Global patent index - EP 0860653 A3

EP 0860653 A3 2000-02-23 - Apparatus for fastening a louvre for luminaire to a luminaire housing

Title (en)

Apparatus for fastening a louvre for luminaire to a luminaire housing

Title (de)

Einrichtung zur Befestigung eines Leuchtenrasters an einem Leuchtengehäuse

Title (fr)

Dispositif de fixation d'une grille pour luminaire au boîtier

Publication

EP 0860653 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98100909 A

Priority

DE 19706500 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0860653A2] The device comprises a spring stirrup (5) with bracing arms (8) connected by connecting rib (7) and fixable to light screen (3) in area of connecting rib. A guide component (6) is arranged in the area of the light housing (2) and has a guide aperture (9) in which the spring stirrup with the bracing arms is adjustably fitted, being held in an upper end position in which the light screen is arranged in the light housing, and in a lower end position. The guide aperture of the guide component is formed as an equilateral triangle and has longitudinal edges, on which the bracing arms of the spring stirrup are located in the lower and upper end positions as well as during adjustment in an electrically conductive fashion. The guide component (6) is a stamped part fixable to the light housing (2) and the guide aperture (9) is formed in a guide surface of the guide component.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21V 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21V 17/16 (2006.01); F21V 23/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21V 17/164 (2013.01); F21V 23/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19706500 A1 19980820; DE 19706500 C2 20001123; AT 308016 T 20051115; DE 59813126 D1 20051201; EP 0860653 A2 19980826; EP 0860653 A3 20000223; EP 0860653 B1 20051026

INPADOC legal status

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160129

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160129

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160331

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-01-29 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 19

2013-10-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130131

2013-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130131

2013-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130131

2013-09-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM01

- Ref Document Number: 308016

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Effective date: 20130131

2013-08-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2013-05-31 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PCAR

- Free Format Text: NEW ADDRESS: FALLSGASSE 7, 9492 ESCHEN (LI)

2013-03-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120123

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120801

2012-12-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120131

2012-08-15 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: V1

- Effective date: 20120801

2012-07-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *RIDI-LEUCHTEN G.M.B.H.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20120131

2012-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120126

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-06-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110124

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-05-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110125

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-07-31 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: RIDI-LEUCHTEN GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

2006-10-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20060727

2006-06-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2006-01-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060131

2006-01-04 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20051212

2005-12-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59813126

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-12-01

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-11-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: BOGENSBERGER PATENT- & MARKENBUERO DR. BURKHARD BO

2005-10-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2005-10-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB LI LU NL

2005-10-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2000-11-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH DE FR GB LI LU NL

2000-04-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000228

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-08-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB LI LU NL

1998-08-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI