Global Patent Index - EP 0860662 A3

EP 0860662 A3 2000-10-04 - Cover for terminals of the electric system in cooking plates

Title (en)

Cover for terminals of the electric system in cooking plates

Title (de)

Abdeckplatte für das elektrische System einer Kochplatte

Title (fr)

Couvercle du système électrique d'une plaque de cuisson

Publication

EP 0860662 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98500051 A

Priority

ES 9700353 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0860662A2] Cover for the lodging and the connection for the terminals of the electronic system in cooking plates, being of the kind of covers that remain under the ceramic glass and in which the electronic control system of the heater elements is placed and connected and being formed by a support body (1) that has in one of its lateral surfaces a cope (2) in which it is defined a seat base (3) of bigger width than the upper seat base (10) of the lid, being the connecter (4), which is endowed of the aligned connection terminals (5), placed on the cited base (3), so that the lateral surfaces of the cope (2) of the support (1) have each vertical clefts (7). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24C 15/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24C 15/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24C 15/104 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0860662 A2 19980826; EP 0860662 A3 20001004; ES 2130978 A1 19990701; ES 2130978 B1 20000216

INPADOC legal status


2001-03-28 [18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN

- Date of withdrawal: 20010129

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: BSH BALAY, S.A.

1999-07-07 [R17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 19990327

1999-06-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990413

1998-08-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-08-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI