Global Patent Index - EP 0860788 A3

EP 0860788 A3 2000-01-05 - Intelligent transaction

Title (en)

Intelligent transaction

Title (de)

Intelligente Transaktion

Title (fr)

Transaction intelligente

Publication

EP 0860788 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98660005 A

Priority

FI 970777 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0860788A2] A plurality of steps, which are intended to modify the data in a transaction, form a transaction (40) comprising statements (41, 42, 43). In the method according to the invention there is formed a data exchange space (47) common to the transaction in order to make the parameters available to the statements belonging to the transaction and in order to transmit data between the statements belonging to the transaction. The system (30) maintaining the first version of the database is arranged to store the modifications to be made in the database as transactions, which comprise statements as well as parameters, both regarding the statements and regarding the transaction. The system (31) maintaining the second database version is arranged to form a transaction on the basis of the message it receives, whereby the transaction comprises statements, and to reserve an information exchange space (47) in the system memory in order to make the parameters available to the statements belonging to the transaction and in order to transmit data between the statements belonging to the transaction. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 17/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 17/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06Q 30/0601 (2013.01); G06F 17/30371 (2013.01); G06Q 40/08 (2013.01); G06Q 40/12 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0860788 A2 19980826; EP 0860788 A3 20000105; EP 0860788 B1 20110504; AT 508420 T 20110515; DE 69842248 D1 20110616; FI 111195 B 20030613; FI 970777 A0 19970224; FI 970777 A 19980825; US 6144941 A 20001107

INPADOC legal status


2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160125

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160129

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150202

2015-10-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150930

2014-05-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140117

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-01-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120128

2012-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120131

2012-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120131

2012-10-24 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2012-08-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2012-05-31 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 69842248

- Effective date: 20120207

2012-04-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20120207

2011-12-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110504

2011-11-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110504

2011-08-24 [REG NL VDEP] INVALID IN THE NETHERLANDS AS NO TRANSLATION HAS BEEN FILED

- Effective date: 20110504

2011-07-13 [REG GB 746] REGISTER NOTED 'LICENCES OF RIGHT' (SECT. 46/1977)

- Effective date: 20110620

2011-06-16 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 69842248

- Effective date: 20110616

2011-06-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69842248 P 20110616

2011-05-25 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2011-05-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2011-05-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IE LI NL

2011-05-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2010-10-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: OY INTERNATIONAL BUSINESS MACHINES AB

2005-08-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050614

2000-09-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE FR GB IE LI NL

2000-08-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000523

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-08-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IE LI NL

1998-08-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI